Lottery v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Darricka Latonya Lottery
Defendant: Social Security, Commissioner of and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01512
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Referring Judge: Jonathan D Greenberg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Copy of #4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order, #5 Notice of Magistrate Consent form, Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis mailed to Darricka Latonya Lottery at 1126 Woodland Ave Toledo, OH 43607 on 8/19/2019. (S,SR)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to U. S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (S,SR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2019: #1 Corrected Summons and USM forms) (S,SR).
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,SR)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 8/19/2019. (S,SR)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Approved by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 8/19/2019.(S,SR)
August 8, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 8/8/19. (C,D)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/2/2019. (K,AR)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Darricka Latonya Lottery. (K,AR)
July 2, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (K,AR)
July 2, 2019 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (K,AR)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP pending. Filed by Darricka Latonya Lottery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285, #4 Notice of Appeals Council Action, #5 The Toledo Clinic Certificate of Blindness 2018, #6 The Toledo Clinic Certificate of Blindness 2019, #7 Jurisdiction and Procedural History) (K,AR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lottery v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security, Commissioner of
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darricka Latonya Lottery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?