Ladd et al v. Marchbanks
Plaintiff: Gerardo Saldana, David Saldana, Marcelino Saldana, Abigail Ladd, Melinda Addenbrock, Alicia Roberts, Christina Gonzales, Deanna McCrate and Ida Duenke
Defendant: Director Jack Marchbanks
Case Number: 3:2019cv01609
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for leave to file a motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Jack Marchbanks. Related document(s) #9 , #8 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email Between Counsel)(Cole, William)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Leandro M. Cordero filed by on behalf of Jack Marchbanks. (Cordero, Leandro)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 26(a)(1) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Murry, Zachary)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order denying #7 Motion to Transfer Venue. Defendant shall file an Answer by September 30, 2019. Any future motions should comply with this Court's Civil Case Management Procedures #4 . Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/21/2019.(D,L)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice. This Court held a Phone Status on 8/20/2019. Case management conference to be held on Friday, October 11, 2019 at 2 PM. Counsel may participate by phone and party attendance is not required. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/21/2019. (15 mins)(D,L)
August 19, 2019 NOTICE [non-document] of Phone Status set for 8/20/19 at 12:30 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to change/transfer venue filed by Defendant Jack Marchbanks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' complaint against ODOT in the Ohio Court of Claims) (Cole, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Jack Marchbanks waiver sent on 8/6/2019, answer due 9/15/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Murry, Zachary) Modified on 8/6/2019 (D,L).
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by William J. Cole filed by on behalf of Jack Marchbanks. (Cole, William)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/16/2019. (M,L)
July 16, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Jack Marchbanks. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
July 15, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
July 15, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Murry, Zachary)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Jack Marchbanks. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9416482.. Filed by Marcelino Saldana, Ida Duenke, Alicia Roberts, Deanna McCrate, Christina Gonzales, Melinda Addenbrock, Abigail Ladd, Gerardo Saldana, David Saldana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Murry, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ladd et al v. Marchbanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Saldana
Represented By: Marvin A. Robon
Represented By: Zachary J. Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Saldana
Represented By: Marvin A. Robon
Represented By: Zachary J. Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelino Saldana
Represented By: Marvin A. Robon
Represented By: Zachary J. Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Ladd
Represented By: Marvin A. Robon
Represented By: Zachary J. Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Addenbrock
Represented By: Marvin A. Robon
Represented By: Zachary J. Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Roberts
Represented By: Marvin A. Robon
Represented By: Zachary J. Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Gonzales
Represented By: Marvin A. Robon
Represented By: Zachary J. Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna McCrate
Represented By: Marvin A. Robon
Represented By: Zachary J. Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Duenke
Represented By: Marvin A. Robon
Represented By: Zachary J. Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Jack Marchbanks
Represented By: Leandro M. Cordero
Represented By: William J. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?