Shroyer Trucking LLC v. CSX Transportation, Inc
Plaintiff: Shroyer Trucking LLC
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01700
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shroyer Trucking LLC. CSX Transportation, Inc waiver sent on 8/14/2019, answer due 10/15/2019 filed on behalf of Shroyer Trucking LLC (Trombley, Logan)
July 26, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (D,TM)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon CSX Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (D,TM)
July 26, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (D,TM)
July 26, 2019 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (D,TM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Shroyer Trucking LLC. Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0647-9437643.. Filed by Shroyer Trucking LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Contract w Klienhenz Livestock, #4 Exhibit B - Kieinhenz Livestock Invoices, #5 Exhibit C - USDOT Crossing Inventory Form, #6 Exhibit D - Pictures of Crossing, #7 Exhibit E - Pictures of Asphalt Defect, #8 Exhibit F - Pictures of Collision, #9 Exhibit G - Old Truck Bill of Sale, #10 Exhibit H - Old Trailer Lease, #11 Exhibit I - Vet Bill, #12 Exhibit J - Truck and Trailer Tow Bill, #13 Exhibit K - Putnam Cty Traffic Bill, #14 Exhibit L - Trailer Disposal Costs, #15 Exhibit M - New Truck Lease, #16 Exhibit N - New Trailer Lease) (Trombley, Logan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shroyer Trucking LLC v. CSX Transportation, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc
Represented By: James R. Carnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shroyer Trucking LLC
Represented By: Logan R. Trombley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?