Ervin v. W&A Distribution Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jabbar K. Ervin
Defendant: W&A Distribution Services, Inc. and Virginia M. Gordon
Case Number: 3:2019cv01812
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 9/30/19. Counsel shall exchange initial disclosures, and then complete and ECF file the attached Report of the Parties for Court's review and approval. Counsel should also indicate whether a Case Management Conference is desired (when and how) and, in the interim, continue settlement discussions. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/30/19. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting) (S,Na)
September 24, 2019 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 9/30/19 at 1:30 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Virginia M. Gordon, W&A Distribution Services, Inc.. (Cuneo, Richard)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/9/2019. (M,L)
August 9, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Virginia M. Gordon, W&A Distribution Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
August 9, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
August 9, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Virginia M. Gordon, W&A Distribution Services, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9462609. Filed by Jabbar K. Ervin. (Attachments: #1Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - W&A Distribution Services, Inc., #3 Summons- Gordon) (Bruno, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ervin v. W&A Distribution Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W&A Distribution Services, Inc.
Represented By: Richard P. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia M. Gordon
Represented By: Richard P. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jabbar K. Ervin
Represented By: Charles E. Boyk
Represented By: Michael A. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?