Lalonde et al v. Russell et al
Plaintiff: Michel Lalonde and Vicky LaLonde
Defendant: David Russell, Kevin Cameron and Dominion of Canada General Insurance
Case Number: 3:2019cv01877
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Referring Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Service of Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents, and Request for Admissions to Plaintiffs Michel Lalonde, Vicky Lalonde and Defendant David Russell filed by Kevin Cameron. (Gray, Todd)
February 3, 2020 LAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 15, 2020 Filing 21 Designation of Expert Witnesses filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bruno, Michael)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order. Settlement Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 01:00 PM in Chambers 318 before Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II. Ex parte settlement statements shall be submitted via email to Knepp_chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 5/11/2020. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 1/13/2020. (S,JM)
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 Initial Disclosures Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(A)(1) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bruno, Michael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 18 Initial Disclosures filed by Kevin Cameron. (Gray, Todd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 Initial Disclosures filed by David Russell. (Seitzinger, Mark)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order of Case Management Conference held on 11/18/2019. Case is assigned to the standard track. Time: 15 minutes. Discovery due by 3/2/2020. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 12/13/2019. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II for a settlement conference during the months of April or May 2020, at the mutual convenience of Judge Knepp and the parties. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/19/2019. (S,AL)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bruno, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice: conference to be held on 11/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers 210 before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(S,AL)
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 Answer to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Kevin Cameron. (Gray, Todd)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Order and Notice of Party Dismissal of The Dominion of Canada General Insurance without prejudice. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/15/2019. (S,AL)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of partial voluntary Dismissal under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Dominion of Canada General Insurance, Only, with prejudice filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bruno, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Stipulation & Order granting defendant Kevin Cameron until 10/28/2019 within which to move, plead, or otherwise respond to the complaint. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/1/2019. (S,AL)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 Joint Stipulated Leave until 10/28/2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kevin Cameron. Related document(s) #2 .(Gray, Todd)
September 19, 2019 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case, Judge Jack Zouhary terminated. (M,L)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/19/2019. (D,L)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying subsidiary as Travelers Insurance Group for Dominion of Canada General Insurance filed by Dominion of Canada General Insurance. (Corl, Christina)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Dominion of Canada General Insurance. Dominion of Canada General Insurance waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of Dominion of Canada General Insurance (Corl, Christina)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Christina L. Corl filed by on behalf of Dominion of Canada General Insurance. (Corl, Christina)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Service of Interrogatories and Request for Production Upon Plaintiffs Michael LaLonde and Vicky LaLonde filed by David Russell. (Seitzinger, Mark)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by David Russell. (Seitzinger, Mark)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/16/2019. (M,L)
August 16, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Kevin Cameron, Dominion of Canada General Insurance, David Russell. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
August 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
August 16, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint with jury demand against Kevin Cameron, David Russell, The Dominion of Canada General Insurance. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9475322. Filed by Michel Lalonde, Vicky LaLonde. (Bruno, Michael) Modified to include filing fee information on 8/16/2019: Civil Cover Sheet and Summons attached to document #1 . (M,L).
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet: Complaint filed as document #2 Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9475322. Filed by Michel Lalonde, Vicky LaLonde. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons -Russell, #3 Summons - Cameron, #4 Summons- Dominion of Canada General Insurance) (Bruno, Michael) Modified text to note document attached is a Civil Cover Sheet on 8/16/2019 (M,L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lalonde et al v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel Lalonde
Represented By: Charles E. Boyk
Represented By: Michael A. Bruno
Represented By: Kathleen R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky LaLonde
Represented By: Charles E. Boyk
Represented By: Michael A. Bruno
Represented By: Kathleen R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Russell
Represented By: Mark P. Seitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Cameron
Represented By: Todd A. Gray
Represented By: Joseph M. Fiorello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion of Canada General Insurance
Represented By: Christina L. Corl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?