Erd et al v. Neal et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Erd and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Cassens Transport Company and Sean Neal
Case Number: 3:2019cv01879
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Notice [non-document] of Initial Status Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 09:30 AM to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr. The court will initiate the call to the numbers indicated on the docket unless alternate contact information has been provided to JUDGECARR_CHAMBERS@OHND.USCOURTS.GOV prior to the date of the conference. (C,D)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Cassens Transport Company, Sean Neal. (Corl, Christina)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cassens Transport Company. (Corl, Christina)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (R,Ke)
August 19, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke)
August 19, 2019 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (R,Ke)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court from Lucas County Common Pleas, case number G-4801-CI-0201903330-000 with Jury Demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9476412. Filed by Cassens Transport Company, Sean Neal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lucas County Common Pleas Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Lucas County Clerk of Courts Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Corl, Christina) Modified on 9/4/2019 (M,L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erd et al v. Neal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Erd
Represented By: Stevin J. Groth
Represented By: Steven L. Crossmock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven J. Zeehandelar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassens Transport Company
Represented By: Christina L. Corl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Neal
Represented By: Christina L. Corl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?