Mitchell v. Pathology Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tina Mitchell
Defendant: Pathology Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02246
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Sonic Healthcare Limited for Pathology Laboratories, Inc. filed by Pathology Laboratories, Inc.. (Ferrell, John)
November 5, 2019 Notice by Clerk that Pathology Laboratories, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (R,Ke)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by John C. Ferrell filed by on behalf of Pathology Laboratories, Inc.. (Ferrell, John)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice: conference to be held on 12/10/2019 at 9:00 AM in Chambers 210 before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. (S,AL)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Tina Mitchell. Pathology Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019 filed on behalf of Tina Mitchell (Bryant, Daniel)
September 27, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (R,Ke)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided. No summons issued. (R,Ke)
September 27, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke)
September 27, 2019 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (R,Ke)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for damages and injunctive relief with jury demand against Pathology Laboratories, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9545571. Filed by Tina Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bryant, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Pathology Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Mitchell
Represented By: Laren E. Knoll
Represented By: Matthew B. Bryant
Represented By: Daniel I. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pathology Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Ferrell
Represented By: Nelva J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?