Brown v. Green Bay Packaging, Inc.
Plaintiff: Reginald Brown
Defendant: Green Bay Packaging, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02302
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 NOTICE [non-document]. Phone Status set for 12/9/19 will now be held at 9:15 AM (NOT 11:00 AM) before Judge Jack Zouhary. This Court will initiate the call. (S,Na)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 11/1/19. Counsel shall complete initial disclosures, including personnel file and medical records. Further Phone Status scheduled for 12/9/19 at 11:00 AM. Court will initiate the call. In the interim, all legal filings are stayed, including Defendant's Answer, to allow counsel to explore potential settlement. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/4/19. (S,Na)
October 31, 2019 NOTICE [non-document]. Due to a conflict on this Court's docket, the Initial Phone Status set for 11/1/19 will now be held at 11:15 AM (NOT 4:00 PM) before Judge Jack Zouhary. (S,Na)
October 29, 2019 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 11/1/19 at 4:00 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. This court will initiate the call. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Reginald Brown. Green Bay Packaging, Inc. waiver sent on 10/3/2019, answer due 12/2/2019 filed on behalf of Reginald Brown (Landry, Francis)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Green Bay Packaging, Inc.. (Toth, K.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by K. Ellen Toth filed by on behalf of Green Bay Packaging, Inc.. (Toth, K.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons filed by Reginald Brown. (Landry, Francis)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/3/2019. (M,L)
October 3, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (M,L)
October 3, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
October 3, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Green Bay Packaging, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9555720.. Filed by Reginald Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landry, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Green Bay Packaging, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Bay Packaging, Inc.
Represented By: K. Ellen Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Brown
Represented By: Francis J. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?