Young v. FedEx Supply Chain Distribution Systems Inc et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Young
Defendant: Jason Burke and FedEx Supply Chain Distribution Systems Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv02527
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 Dismissal Order. Counsel represent that this case has resolved. Settled and dismissed without prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs. Any subsequent Dismissal with prejudice filed within 45 days shall supersede this Order. This Court also retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement. The Initial Phone Status set for December 18, 2019 is vacated. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/16/2019. (D,L)
December 10, 2019 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 12/18/19 at 4:00 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Brandon Young. FedEx Supply Chain Distribution Systems Inc waiver sent on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020 filed on behalf of Brandon Young (Dubow, Daniel)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorneys Matthew G. Bruce and Paul Filippelli and adding attorney Daniel S. Dubow and Brian D. Spitz filed by on behalf of Brandon Young. (Dubow, Daniel)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Jason Burke, FedEx Supply Chain Distribution Systems Inc. - 2 issued at Cranberry Township, PA and Lima, OH addresses (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (R,Ke) Modified text on 10/30/2019 (R,Ke).
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (W,CM)
October 29, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (W,CM)
October 29, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (W,CM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:19-cv-04764. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 29, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio, Western Division at Toledo. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (jlk) [Transferred from ohsd on 10/29/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - The Clerk is DIRECTED TO TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio Western Division at Toledo, which serves Allen County. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on October 29, 2019. (jlk) [Transferred from ohsd on 10/29/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND FOR DAMAGES AND REINSTATEMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7175472), filed by Brandon Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Right To Sue, #3 Summons Form x 3) (Filippelli, Paul) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (kk2) [Transferred from ohsd on 10/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. FedEx Supply Chain Distribution Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Supply Chain Distribution Systems Inc
Represented By: Angelique Paul Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Young
Represented By: Paul Filippelli
Represented By: Matthew G. Bruce
Represented By: Brian D. Spitz
Represented By: Daniel S. Dubow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?