Schwamberger v. Marion County Board of Elections et al
Plaintiff: C. Sue Schwamberger
Defendant: Marion County Board of Elections and F. John Meyer
Case Number: 3:2019cv02626
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 12/18/19. Counsel are exchanging letters regarding the potential dismissal of federal claims alleged in the Complaint (Doc. #1 at 18-21). Letters should be forwarded to this Court by 1/9/20 after which this Court will initiate another Phone Status. All legal filings are stayed until further Order of this Court. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/19/19. (S,Na)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance of Jeffrey A. Stankunas and Matthew R. Aumann for Defendant Marion County Board of Elections by Matthew R. Aumann filed by on behalf of Marion County Board of Elections. (Aumann, Matthew)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by F. John Meyer. (Williams, Richard)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Marion County Board of Elections on 11/25/2019, filed on behalf of C. Sue Schwamberger Related document(s) #1 , #7 . (D,TM)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon F. John Meyer on 11/23/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of C. Sue Schwamberger. Related document(s) #1 , #7 . (D,TM)
November 19, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Marion County Board of Elections Mail Receipt # 7019 0160 0000 7920 5663 and F. John Meyer Mail Receipt # 7019 0160 0000 7920 5694. Placed in U.S. Mail, Type of service: certified mail. (K,AR)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Marion County Board of Elections, F. John Meyer. (R,Ke)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by C. Sue Schwamberger. (Ratliff, J.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by C. Sue Schwamberger. (Ratliff, J.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/12/2019. (M,L)
November 12, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (M,L)
November 12, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
November 12, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Request to Clerk for service upon Marion County Board of Elections, F. John Meyer by certified mail. filed by C. Sue Schwamberger. (Ratliff, J.)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Marion County Board of Elections, F. John Meyer. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9621091.. Filed by C. Sue Schwamberger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ratliff, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwamberger v. Marion County Board of Elections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion County Board of Elections
Represented By: Matthew R. Aumann
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Stankunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. John Meyer
Represented By: Richard A. Williams
Represented By: Susan S.R. Petro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. Sue Schwamberger
Represented By: J. C. Ratliff
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Ratliff
Represented By: Rocky J. Ratliff
Represented By: Edwin M. Bibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?