Hamilton et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Marklyn E Hamilton and Jay R. Hamilton
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02673
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 8, 2020 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 1/14/20 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Kathryn M. Eyster filed by All Plaintiffs. (Eyster, Kathryn)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Daniel L. McGookey filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (McGookey, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (King, Scott)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/14/19. (K,AR)
November 14, 2019 FILING ERROR- Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (K,AR) Modified on 11/19/2019 (D,TM).
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (K,AR)
November 14, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (K,AR)
November 14, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (K,AR)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Co. for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (King, Scott)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Erie County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019 CV 0576 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9628322. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State court docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (King, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marklyn E Hamilton
Represented By: Kathryn M. Eyster
Represented By: Daniel L. McGookey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay R. Hamilton
Represented By: Kathryn M. Eyster
Represented By: Daniel L. McGookey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jessica E. Salisbury-Copper
Represented By: Scott A. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?