United States for the use and benefit of Bay Mechanical Corporation v. JC Custom JV et al
Plaintiff: United States for the use and benefit of Bay Mechanical Corporation and United States for the use and benefit of Bay Mechanical & Electrical Corporation
Defendant: Lexon Insurance Company and JC Custom JV
Case Number: 3:2019cv02687
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 1/9/20. Counsel shall reach out to Siemens and continue settlement discussions. Counsel shall file a brief Joint Status Report by 2/12/20. In the interim, counsel may contact Chambers for any needed assistance; and this Court stays any legal filings until further Order of Court. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/10/20. (S,Na)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Jennifer L. Cook filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Cook, Jennifer)
December 19, 2019 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 1/9/20 at 10:30 AM (EST) before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States for the use and benefit of Bay Mechanical & Electrical Corporation. Lexon Insurance Company waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020 filed on behalf of United States for the use and benefit of Bay Mechanical & Electrical Corporation (Savidge, Keith)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States for the use and benefit of Bay Mechanical & Electrical Corporation. JC Custom JV waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020 filed on behalf of United States for the use and benefit of Bay Mechanical & Electrical Corporation (Savidge, Keith)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by United States for the use and benefit of Bay Mechanical & Electrical Corporation. (Savidge, Keith)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/15/2019. (K,AR)
November 15, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (K,AR)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (K,AR)
November 15, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (K,AR)
November 15, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (K,AR)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - document not flattened, unreadable. Attorney contacted to refile. Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by United States for the use and benefit of Bay Mechanical & Electrical Corporation. (Savidge, Keith) Modified on 11/18/2019 (R,Ke).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9630531. Filed by United States for the use and benefit of Bay Mechanical & Electrical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Award, #3 Exhibit Bond, #4 Exhibit Subcontract face sheet) (Savidge, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States for the use and benefit of Bay Mechanical Corporation v. JC Custom JV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexon Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer L. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JC Custom JV
Represented By: Jennifer L. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States for the use and benefit of Bay Mechanical Corporation
Represented By: Keith A. Savidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States for the use and benefit of Bay Mechanical & Electrical Corporation
Represented By: Keith A. Savidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?