Sturgil v. Lazer Spot, Inc.
Plaintiff: Summer Sturgil
Defendant: Lazer Spot, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00147
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of Case Dismissal with prejudice. Judge James G. Carr on 3/14/2020. (D,TM)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion to dismiss case with prejudice filed by Plaintiff Summer Sturgil. (Hymore, Ryan)
March 10, 2020 Copy of #5 Default Entered mailed to Lazer Spot, Inc. at Ste. 1330, 50 W. Broad Street, Columbus, OH 43215 on 3/10/2020. (D,TM)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 Default Entered on 3/10/2020 against Lazer Spot, Inc. Sandy Opacich, Clerk by Tina M. Damoah, Deputy Clerk. Related Document #4 . (D,TM)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Lazer Spot, Inc. filed by Summer Sturgil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Ryan K. Hymore)(Hymore, Ryan)
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Lazer Spot, Inc. on 1/27/2020, filed on behalf of Summer Sturgil. Related document(s) #2 . (R,Ke)
January 23, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Lazer Spot, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7019 1640 0001 4540 3144. (M,L)
January 22, 2020 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Lazer Spot, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
January 22, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
January 22, 2020 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (M,L)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Lazer Spot, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9737686.. Filed by Summer Sturgil. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Hymore, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturgil v. Lazer Spot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Sturgil
Represented By: Ryan K. Hymore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lazer Spot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?