DeSelms v. Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn DeSelms
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company and Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00586
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order of Case Management Conference held on 6/9/2020. Case is assigned to the standard track. Time: 10 minutes. Discovery due by 10/30/2020. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 7/6/2020. Plaintiff's expert disclosure and report September 1, 2020; Defendants' expert disclosure and report October 1, 2020; Expert depositions October 30, 2020. Telephone Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 10:00 AM. Counsel shall call the Court's bridge line, 877-411-9748, access code 1231873, to participate in that conference. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/12/2020. (S,AL)
June 3, 2020 Notice [Non-document]: case management conference scheduled for 6/3/2020 vacated and rescheduled for 6/9/2020 at 2:00 PM telephonically before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. Counsel to call the bridge line at 877-411-9748, access code 1231873. (S,AL)
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Co. (Daley, Bridget - s/Kathleen Jones Goldman) Modified signer on 5/29/2020 (R,Ke).
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice: case management conference to be held on 6/3/2020 at 10:00 AM telephonically before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. (see notice for details) (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(S,AL)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Bridget J. Daley for Norfolk Southern Railway Co.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #7 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/21/2020.(S,AL)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kathleen J. Goldman for Norfolk Southern Railway Co. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #6 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/21/2020.(S,AL)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Bridget Joyce Daley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-9927599, filed by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bridget Joyce Daley for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Schueller, Christopher)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Kathleen Jones Goldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-9927584, filed by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kathleen Jones Goldman for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Schueller, Christopher)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation for Norfolk Southern Railway Co. filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Co.. (Schueller, Christopher)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 Answer to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Co.. (Schueller, Christopher)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR- incomplete document. Attorney contacted to refile. Return of Service by process server executed upon Norfolk Southern Railway Co. on 3/27/2020, filed on behalf of Kaitlyn DeSelms Related document(s) #1 . (Thompson, Nicholas) Modified on 4/14/2020 (R,Ke).
March 18, 2020 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Norfolk Southern Railway Co. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
March 18, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
March 18, 2020 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Norfolk Southern Railway Co. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-9868186.. Filed by Kaitlyn DeSelms. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Thompson, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeSelms v. Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Represented By: Kathleen J. Goldman
Represented By: Christopher P. Schueller
Represented By: Bridget J. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn DeSelms
Represented By: Nicholas D. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?