JTH Tax LLC v. Mayes et al
Plaintiff: JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service and JTH Tax LLC
Defendant: Aaron C. Mayes, A&S Accounting Service, LLC dba Aaron Mayes Tax & Accounting and A&S Accounting Service, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00719
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Order: [non-document] Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/18/2020 before Judge James G. Carr. Time: 5 minutes. Parties to file Status Report or Stipulated Dismissal by 7/1/2020. Judge James G. Carr on 5/18/2020. (D,TM)
May 11, 2020 Utility Event correcting Service & Answer Report to reflect that Answer to #1 Complaint was filed by A&S Accounting Service, LLC. (Filer was not selected when answer was filed #15 ). (R,Ke)
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Aaron C. Mayes, A&S Accounting Service, LLC. (Landry, Francis) Modified filer on 5/12/2020 (R,Ke).
May 9, 2020 Filing 14 Status Report filed by All Defendants. (Landry, Francis)
May 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants #13 Amended Motion for extension of time until 5/11/2020 to answer #1 Complaint. A&S Accounting Service, LLC answer due 5/11/2020; Aaron C. Mayes answer due 5/11/2020. Judge James G. Carr on 5/2/2020. (D,TM)
April 30, 2020 Filing 13 Amended Motion for extension of time until May 11, 2020 to answer (Amended to Correct Improper Header on Doc. #12) filed by A&S Accounting Service, LLC, Aaron C. Mayes. Related document(s) #12 . (Landry, Francis)
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 Motion for extension of time until May 11, 2020 to answer Complaint filed by A&S Accounting Service, LLC, Aaron C. Mayes. (Landry, Francis)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - incomplete document, wrong event. Attorney contacted to refile. Return of Service by personal service executed upon Aaron C. Mayes on 4/7/2020, filed on behalf of JTH Tax LLC (Siachos, Peter) Modified on 4/14/2020 (R,Ke).
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Order: [non-document] Telephonic Status Conference held 4/13/2020. Court reporter: Stacey Kiprotich. Time: 10 minutes. Status Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 12:00 PM to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr. Parties to call into court's conference line at 1-877-336-1839, access code 8856866. If parties have not settled and the conference is to be held, the parties to file Status Reports by 5/8/2020. Judge James G. Carr on 4/13/2020. (D,TM)
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of non-Service by personal service upon Aaron C. Mayes on 4/10/2020, filed on behalf of JTH Tax LLC Related document(s) #4 , #6 . (Siachos, Peter) Modified text on 4/13/2020 (R,Ke).
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Service by personal service executed upon A&S Accounting Service, LLC on 4/10/2020, filed on behalf of JTH Tax LLC Related document(s) #4 , #6 . (Siachos, Peter) Modified text on 4/13/2020 (R,Ke).
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Francis J. Landry filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Landry, Francis)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 Service Acknowledged by Kim Boggs as Authorized Agent for A&S Accounting, LLC on April 7, 2020 filed on behalf of JTH Tax LLC Related document(s) #6 , #3 , #4 , #1 . (Siachos, Peter) Modified on 4/14/2020, 5/12/2020 (R,Ke).
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 Minute Order of Telephonic Conference regarding pending #4 motion for temporary restraining order held before Judge James G. Carr on 4/8/2020. Court reporter: Angela Nixon: Time: 25 minute. Defendants shall contact plaintiffs counsel, preferably with counsel, by noon, Friday, 4/10/2020, to inform plaintiff's counsel of status of securing counsel; Status Conference set for 4/13/2020 at 11:30 AM to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr. Parties to call court's conference line at 877-336-1839, access code 8856866, at which time defendants shall show cause why said motion should not be granted; defendants' failure to participate in such conference shall result in issuance of said temporary restraining order, with sanctions to result if defendants fail to comply with each and every term and condition of the order; and Plaintiff to undertake forthwith to cause a copy of this order to be served on the defendants; said service, if defendants are unable or unwilling to accept hand-to-hand service, may be accomplished by taping copies of this order to places of ingress and egress at defendants' last known location(s); said taping to be both outward and inward facing. Judge James G. Carr on 4/8/2020. (D,TM)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance of Peter Siachos by Gregory D. Brunton filed by on behalf of JTH Tax LLC. (Brunton, Gregory)
April 8, 2020 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 4/8/2020 at 12:30 PM to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr. Parties to call into Court's conference line at 877-336-1839, access code #8856866. (D,TM)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction filed by Plaintiff JTH Tax LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Amburgey Declaration, #3 Exhibit Gregg Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Brunton, Gregory)
April 3, 2020 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon A&S Accounting Service, LLC, Aaron C. Mayes (2 Summons issued at 2 different addresses). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
April 3, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
April 3, 2020 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (M,L)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Franchise Group Intermediate L 2, LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group Intermediate L 1, LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group Intermediate L, LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group New Holdco, LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group, Inc. for JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service filed by JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service. (Brunton, Gregory)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint (Verified) against A&S Accounting Service, LLC dba Aaron Mayes Tax & Accounting, Aaron C. Mayes. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-9898943.. Filed by JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-OH176 Franchise Agreement, #3 Exhibit B- OH177 Franchise Agreement, #4 Exhibit C-Notice to Cure, #5 Exhibit D-Termination Notice, #6 Summons A&S, #7 Summons Mayes at 119 Stella, #8 Summons Mayes at 113 Stella) (Brunton, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JTH Tax LLC v. Mayes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax LLC
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Represented By: Peter G. Siachos
Represented By: Carrie E. Thiem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron C. Mayes
Represented By: Francis J. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&S Accounting Service, LLC dba Aaron Mayes Tax & Accounting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&S Accounting Service, LLC
Represented By: Francis J. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?