Mulligan v. First Federal Bank of the Midwest
Plaintiff: Tara Mulligan
Defendant: First Federal Bank of the Midwest
Case Number: 3:2020cv00870
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Judge James G. Carr on 5/28/2020. (D,TM)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Rebecca E. Shope filed by on behalf of First Federal Bank of the Midwest. (Shope, Rebecca)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Tara Mulligan. First Federal Bank of the Midwest waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020 filed on behalf of Tara Mulligan (Landry, Francis)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons filed by Tara Mulligan. (Landry, Francis)
April 22, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
April 22, 2020 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. Judge Jack Zouhary terminated. (M,L)
April 22, 2020 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. Recused pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-26-1. (M,L)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Tara Mulligan. (Landry, Francis)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against First Federal Bank of the Midwest. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Tara Mulligan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landry, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mulligan v. First Federal Bank of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Mulligan
Represented By: Francis J. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Federal Bank of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?