Volkmer v. Coast Professional, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jacob C. Volkmer
Defendant: Coast Professional, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01165
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 NOTICE [non-document] of Phone Status set for 7/28/20 at 2:30 PM (EDT) before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #15 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until July 28, 2020 to answer. Coast Professional, Inc. answer now due 7/28/2020. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/6/2020.(D,L)
June 30, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Coast Professional, Inc.. (Cunningham, Andrew)
June 30, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until July 28, 2020 to answer plaintiff's complaint filed by Defendant Coast Professional, Inc.. (Cunningham, Andrew)
June 30, 2020 Filing 14 Attorney Appearance by Andrew E. Cunningham filed by on behalf of Coast Professional, Inc.. (Cunningham, Andrew)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by James K. Schultz filed by on behalf of Coast Professional, Inc.. (Schultz, James)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Coast Professional, Inc., filed on behalf of Jacob C. Volkmer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Card-Certified Mail)(Spitler, Nathaniel)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Coast Professional, Inc. on 6/8/2020, filed on behalf of Jacob C. Volkmer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Card-Certified Mail)(Spitler, Nathaniel)
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 Temporary Restraining Order. Defendant Coast Professional, Inc. is enjoined from collecting or attempting to collect a wage garnishment upon Plaintiff Jacob Volkmer. The parties should maintain the status quo until this Court has had an opportunity to hear from Defendant. Plaintiff shall immediately notify this Court when service has been completed upon Defendant and as soon as Plaintiff becomes aware of the name of counsel for Defendant, at which time this Court will schedule a telephone status call with counsel. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/9/2020.(D,L)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jacob C. Volkmer. Related document(s) 8 . (Spitler, Nathaniel)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - Filer contacted to refile as text searchable. Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jacob C. Volkmer. Related document(s) 6 . (Spitler, Nathaniel) Modified on 6/4/2020 (K,AR).
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 Supplement to Complaint,, - Civil Cover Sheet 2, filed by Jacob C. Volkmer. Related document(s) #1 . (Spitler, Nathaniel)
May 28, 2020 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Complete Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court. Contacted Attorney to Refile. Related document(s) #1 . (K,AR)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/28/20. (K,AR)
May 28, 2020 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (K,AR)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Coast Professional, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (K,AR)
May 28, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (K,AR)
May 28, 2020 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (K,AR)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 Request to Clerk for service upon Coast Professional, Inc. by Certified Mail. filed by Jacob C Volkmer. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 ERROR: Blank form. Additional Summons for Statutory Agent)(Spitler, Nathaniel) Modified to note blank form on 5/29/2020 (M,L).
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Coast Professional, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10005831. Filed by Jacob C Volkmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet(page 2 missing), #2 Summons, #3Exhibit A-Notice of Garnishment, #4Exhibit B-Document request letter, #5 Exhibit C- Hearing request letter, #6 Exhibit D-Wage Garnishment Order, #7 Exhibit E- Garnishment Pause letter, #8 Exhibit F- 2nd Notice of Garnishment, #9 Exhibit G- FOIA request, #10 Exhibit H- Plaintiff Verified Complaint Affidavit) (Spitler, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volkmer v. Coast Professional, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Professional, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew E. Cunningham
Represented By: James K. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob C. Volkmer
Represented By: Nathaniel E. Spitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?