Liggons v. General Motors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Liggons
Defendant: Local 14, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America and General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01208
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Local 14, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. (Torzewski, Joan)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Local 14, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. (Torzewski, Joan)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Joan Torzewski filed by on behalf of Local 14, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. (Torzewski, Joan)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shawn Liggons. Local 14, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America waiver sent on 6/3/2020, answer due 8/3/2020 filed on behalf of Shawn Liggons (Landry, Francis)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shawn Liggons. General Motors, LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2020, answer due 8/3/2020 filed on behalf of Shawn Liggons (Landry, Francis)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motor Holdings, LLC for General Motors, LLC filed by General Motors, LLC. (Toth, K.)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by K. Ellen Toth and Federico G. Barrera filed by on behalf of General Motors, LLC. (Toth, K.)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons--directed to Defendant UAW Local 14 filed by Shawn Liggons. (Landry, Francis)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons (directed to General Motors, LLC) filed by Shawn Liggons. (Landry, Francis)
June 2, 2020 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (M,L)
June 2, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
June 2, 2020 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10014810.. Filed by shawn liggons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Copy of EEOC Charge against General Motors, LLC, #2 Exhibit B-Copy of Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit C-Copy of EEOC Charge against UAW Local 14, #4 Exhibit D-Copy of Notice of Right to Sue as to charge against UAW Local 14, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landry, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liggons v. General Motors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Liggons
Represented By: Francis J. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 14, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Represented By: Joan Torzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Federico G. Barrera, III
Represented By: K. Ellen Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?