Gitler v. Ohio EPA et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Gitler and Pat Gitler doing business as Peaceful Acres Mobile Home Park now known as Whispering Winds
Defendant: Ohio EPA and Assistant Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2020cv01386
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Opposition to #6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Pat Gitler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8-5: Water test required for well, #2 Envelope)(R,Ke)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim with Memorandum in support filed by Assistant Attorney General, Ohio EPA. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Order)(Helkowski, Lawrence)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Proof of Service of Plaintiff's Summons (summons were not issued by Clerk) sent via USPS to David Yoist, Ohio Attorney General and Ohio EPA filed by Pat Gitler. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(S,DM)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 Supplement to #1 Complaint, Praecipe for Issuance filed by Pat Gitler. Related document(s) #3 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(K,AR)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 Supplement to #1 Complaint, Summons Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(K,AR)
June 24, 2020 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (K,AR)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided so they were not issued. (K,AR)
June 24, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (K,AR)
June 24, 2020 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (K,AR)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Assistant Attorney General, Ohio EPA. Filing fee paid. 400.00. Receipt # 34660011919. Filed by Patricia Gitler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1 - OAC 3745-81-76-(A)-(B)-(2)-(b) Before revision, #3 Exhibit 2 - 3745-81-76 Water Source Designation After Change, #4 Exhibit 3 - Well Log, #5 Exhibit 4 - Required Well Water Test, #6 Exhibit 5 - Pat Gitler Letter to Water Department, #7 Exhibit 6 - Letter from Lucas County dated 5/23/19, #8 Exhibit 7 - Civil Penalty Calculation for Peaceful Acres MHP, #9 Exhibit 8 - 38 Void Violations Before 10-29-2005 Five Year Statute of Limitation OAC 3745-31-(b)-(1), #10 Exhibit 9 - Tri county Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc. After Hours Outages, September 1998, #11 Exhibit 10 - Ohio EPA Evaluation Inventory Report, #12 Exhibit 11 - Deposition, #13 Exhibit 12 - Procedure to install a surface water system, #14 Exhibit 13 - Ohio EPA Re: Lucas County Peaceful Acres MHP Community Letter dated 6/4/96, #15 Exhibit 14 - Ohio EPA Letter Re: Lucas County Peaceful Acres MHP Community Water Supply dated 4/24/98, #16 Exhibit 15 and 16 Civil Penalty Calculation for Peaceful Acres MHP, #17 Exhibit 17 - Additional Cost to Comply with EPA Surface Water Rules, #18 Exhibit 18 - In the Court of Claims of Ohio Claim Form, #19 Exhibit 19 - Lucas County Common Pleas Court Answer to Complaint, #20 Exhibit 20 - Common Pleas Lucas County Order Granting Joint Application for Appointment of a Receiver to Operate Peaceful Acres Mobil Home Park, #21 Exhibit 21 -60B Motion for Relief Fraudulent From Judgment Plus Two Million Dollars Punitive Damages for Fraud, #22 Exhibit 22 - Lucas County Sheriff's Office Booking Summary, #23 Exhibit 23 - In the Court of Common Pleas Civil Division Objection to Auction Sale, #24 Exhibit 24 - Peaceful Acres Land Contract / Whispering Winds, #25 Exhibit 25 - W2, #26 EPA Exhibit List, #27 EPA Photos, #28 EPA Exhibits, #29 Civil Cover Sheet, #30 Envelope) (K,AR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gitler v. Ohio EPA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio EPA
Represented By: Lawrence S. Helkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Attorney General
Represented By: Lawrence S. Helkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Gitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Gitler doing business as Peaceful Acres Mobile Home Park now known as Whispering Winds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?