Doe v. ProMedica Health System, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: ProMedica Health System, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01581
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 Motion for leave to File Reply Brief filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Reply on Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A - Jane Doe v. MedStar Health, Inc. - Order)(Hulick, Kevin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 Opposition to #14 Motion to remand to State Court filed by ProMedica Health System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executive Order: Incentives for the Use of Health Information Technology, #2 Exhibit B - Federal Health IT Strategic Plan 2011-2015, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Debi Brobst, #4 Exhibit D - A 10-Year Vision, #5 Exhibit E - Federal Health IT Strategic Plan 2015-2020)(Carney, David)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to remand to State Court with Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Richard M. Smith)(Hulick, Kevin)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Striking Plaintiff Briefing. This Court granted Plaintiff permission to file a Motion to Remand, with a 15 pg limit #10 . Plaintiff then filed a 10 pg document titled "Motion to Remand" #12 . Attached to the Motion is a 15 pg document titled "Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand" (Doc. #12 -3). Plaintiff effectively filed a 25 pg Motion, which this Court now strikes from the record. Motion to Remand now due by August 20, 2020. Opposition due by September 4. To eliminate any remaining confusion, all substantive content in the Motion and supporting brief combined shall not exceed fifteen pages. If more than 15 pgs are necessary, the proper course is to request permission to exceed the limit. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/18/2020. (D,L)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 STRICKEN PER ORDER #13 FILED ON 8/18/2020. Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Richard M. Smith, #3 Brief in Support of Motion to Remand)(Hulick, Kevin) Modified on 8/18/2020 (D,L).
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Joshua Rovenger filed by on behalf of ProMedica Health System, Inc.. (Rovenger, Joshua)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 8/3/20. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand due by 8/17/20; Opposition due by 8/31/20. Fifteen-page maximum each; footnotes strongly discouraged. No Reply or Hearing unless requested by this Court. All deadlines for legal filings are otherwise stayed; the Motion for Extension (Doc. #5 ) is therefore denied as moot. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/3/20. (S,Na)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 Marginal Entry Order granting #7 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Mitchell M. Breit for John Doe. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(K,AR)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 Marginal Entry Order granting #6 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jason "Jay" Barnes for John Doe. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(K,AR)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Mitchell M. Breit, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10140964, filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mitchell M. Breit, Esq.)(Hulick, Kevin)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Jason "Jay" Barnes, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10140930, filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jason "Jay" Barnes, Esq.)(Hulick, Kevin)
July 29, 2020 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 8/3/20 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time for 21 days to answer filed by Defendant ProMedica Health System, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carney, David) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (M,L).
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ProMedica Health System, Inc.. (Carney, David)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/17/2020. (R,Ke)
July 17, 2020 Notice by Clerk that ProMedica Health System, Inc. is reminded of their obligation to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (R,Ke)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (R,Ke)
July 17, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke)
July 17, 2020 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (R,Ke)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas, Lucas County, Ohio, case number G-4801-CI-0202002321-000 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10113215. Filed by ProMedica Health System, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Lucas Co. Common Pleas Complaint, #3 Exhibit B- Lucas Co. Common Pleas Praecipe, #4 Exhibit C- Lucas Co. Common Pleas Summons, #5 Exhibit D- Lucas Co. Common Pleas certified mail returns, #6 Exhibit E- Lucas Co. Common Pleas Motion) (Carney, David) Modified text on 7/17/2020 (R,Ke).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. ProMedica Health System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProMedica Health System, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Carney
Represented By: Joshua Rovenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Kevin C. Hulick
Represented By: Stuart E. Scott
Represented By: Jason O. Barnes
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?