Corpas v. Essex et al
Plaintiff: Mary Corpas
Defendant: Edward Urbanek, Casey Joy, Matthew Essex and Village of Marblehead, Ohio
Case Number: 3:2020cv01806
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #7 Motion for Extension of time in which to move, plead, or answer in response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Edward Urbanek answer due 10/28/2020. Judge James G. Carr on 9/18/2020. (D,TM)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for extension of time until October 28, 2020 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Edward Urbanek. Related document(s) #1 . (Mikula, Chelsea)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #6 Motion for extension of time in which to move, plead or answer in response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Matthew Essex answer due 10/28/2020; Casey Joy answer due 10/28/2020; Village of Marblehead, Ohio answer due 10/28/2020. Judge James G. Carr on 9/9/2020. (D,TM)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for extension of time until October 28, 2020 to answer Complaint filed by Matthew Essex, Casey Joy, Village of Marblehead, Ohio. (Grigsby, Teresa)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Matthew Essex, Casey Joy, Edward Urbanek, Village of Marblehead, Ohio. (R,Ke)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons of Matthew Essex, #2 Summons of the Village of Marblehead, Ohio, #3 Summons of Casey Joy, #4 Summons of Edward Urbanek)(Miller, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2020 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (S,DM)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, therefore, no summons issued. (S,DM)
August 14, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (S,DM)
August 14, 2020 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (S,DM)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Miller, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10184888. Filed by Mary Corpas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Marblehead Police Report, #2 Exhibit B - Criminal Charges) (Miller, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corpas v. Essex et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Urbanek
Represented By: Chelsea R. Mikula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Joy
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Represented By: Teresa L. Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Essex
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Represented By: Teresa L. Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Marblehead, Ohio
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Represented By: Teresa L. Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Corpas
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?