Workman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lora Workman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv01821
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jonathan D Greenberg
Referring Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 Original Summons and USM-285 issued to U. S. Marshal on 9/3/2020 for service upon Attorney General, U.S. Attorney, and Commissioner of Social Security. (S,S)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,S)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 9/3/2020. (S,S)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #1 ). Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 9/3/2020. (S,S)
August 18, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 8/18/2020. (M,L)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,L)
August 18, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (M,L)
August 18, 2020 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Lora Workman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 USM-285 Attorney General, #3 USM-285 General Counsel, #4 USM-285 US Attorney, #5 Summons Regional Counsel, #6 Summons Attorney General, #7 Summons US Attorney) (Yocum, Mindy)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Lora Workman. (Yocum, Mindy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Lora Workman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Regional Counsel, #4 Summons Attorney General, #5 Summons US Attorney, #6 USM-285 Attorney General, #7 USM-285 Regional Counsel, #8 USM-285 US Attorney)(Yocum, Mindy) Modified on 8/18/2020: Complaint refiled as document #3 using correct event. (M,L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Workman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lora Workman
Represented By: Mindy K. Yocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lynne H. Buck
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?