Home-Owners Insurance Company et al v. Sims et al
Plaintiff: P&P Transportation Services, Inc. and Home-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Taurean J. Sims, Midwest Construction Services, Inc., Penske Truck Leasing Co.,L.P. and Clifford B. Finkle, Jr., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01850
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Referring Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Notice by Clerk that Clifford B. Finkle, Jr., Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (M,L)
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Clifford B. Finkle, Jr., Inc., Penske Truck Leasing Co.,L.P.. (Lavalette, Peter)
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Taurean J. Sims. (Kelley, Steven)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Taurean J. Sims. (Kelley, Steven)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Midwest Construction Services, Inc.. (Shonebarger, Rachel)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Georgiton filed by on behalf of Midwest Construction Services, Inc.. (Georgiton, Peter)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to dismiss for lack of juridictionwith memorandum in support filed by Defendant Midwest Construction Services, Inc. (Shonebarger, Rachel) Modified text on 9/17/2020 (M,L).
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Taurean J. Sims answer due 9/30/2020. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/14/2020.(S,AL)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Clifford B. Finkle, Jr., Inc. and Penske Truck Leasing Co.,L.P. answer due 10/6/2020. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/14/2020.(S,AL)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for extension of time until September 30, 2020 to answer Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Taurean J. Sims. Related document(s) #1 . (Kelley, Steven)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for extension of time until October 6, 2020 to answer with memorandum in support filed by Clifford B. Finkle, Jr., Inc., Penske Truck Leasing Co.,L.P. Related document(s) #1 . (Lavalette, Peter)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Midwest Construction Services, Inc. (initialed and marked covid 19) on 8/26/2020, filed on behalf of P&P Transportation Services, Inc.; Home-Owners Insurance Company Related document(s) #2 . (George, Shannon) Modified text on 9/10/2020 (M,L).
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Penske Truck Leasing Co.,L.P. on 8/25/2020, filed on behalf of P&P Transportation Services, Inc.; Home-Owners Insurance Company Related document(s) #2 . (George, Shannon)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by P&P Transportation Services, Inc.. (George, Shannon)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR, blank PDF uploaded, document was refiled as document #5 . Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by P&P Transportation Services, Inc. (George, Shannon) Modified on 8/21/2020 (M,L).
August 20, 2020 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case, Judge Jack Zouhary terminated. (S,DM)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick for all further proceedings as related to 3:20 CV 648. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/20/2020. (D,L)
August 19, 2020 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Clifford B. Finkle, Jr., Inc., Midwest Construction Services, Inc., Penske Truck Leasing Co.,L.P., Taurean J. Sims. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
August 19, 2020 Notice by Clerk that P&P Transportation Services, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (M,L)
August 19, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
August 19, 2020 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Clifford B. Finkle, Jr., Inc., Midwest Construction Services, Inc., Penske Truck Leasing Co.,L.P., Taurean J. Sims. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10198108. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 3:20CV00648. Filed by P&P Transportation Services, Inc., Home-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (George, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home-Owners Insurance Company et al v. Sims et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taurean J. Sims
Represented By: Steven K. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Construction Services, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J. Georgiton
Represented By: Rachel E. Shonebarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co.,L.P.
Represented By: Robert Charles Tucker
Represented By: Peter N. Lavalette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford B. Finkle, Jr., Inc.
Represented By: Robert Charles Tucker
Represented By: Peter N. Lavalette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P&P Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon J. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Shannon J. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?