Brown v. Merit House
Plaintiff: Janet Brown
Defendant: Merit House
Case Number: 3:2020cv02115
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Order: [non-document] Parties have indicated a settlement. Parties to file a Stipulated Dismissal Entry or further Status Report on or before 12/30/2020. Judge James G. Carr on 11/12/2020. (D,TM)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Defendant's #4 Motion for Extension of Time until 11/16/2020 to move, plead or answer to Complaint. Merit House answer due 11/16/2020. Judge James G. Carr on 10/15/2020. (D,TM)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for Extension of Time Until 11/16/2020 to Move, Plead or Answer filed by Defendant Merit House. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Motion for Extension of Time)(Wilhelms, Andrew)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Merit House on 9/28/2020, filed on behalf of Janet Brown (Widman, Marilyn)
September 18, 2020 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Merit House. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
September 18, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
September 18, 2020 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (M,L)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Merit House LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10276995.. Filed by Janet Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Widman, Marilyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Merit House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Brown
Represented By: Marilyn L. Widman
Represented By: Kera L. Paoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merit House
Represented By: Andrew J. Wilhelms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?