Butler v. Adient US LLC
Plaintiff: Kelly Butler
Defendant: Adient US LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02365
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Referring Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Kelly Butler. (Attachments: #1 Nancyne L. Walker Consent Form)(Griffin, Lori)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Kelly Butler. (Attachments: #1 Mark Edwards Consent Form, #2 Mickey Moore Consent Form)(Griffin, Lori)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Kelly Butler. (Attachments: #1 Deanna Benavides Consent Form, #2 Darrell R. Berry Consent Form, #3 Jamie Boris Consent Form, #4 Kevin Cain Consent Form, #5 Miracle Cardell Consent Form, #6 Lisa Castillo Consent Form, #7 Pasook Champada Consent Form, #8 Tanya Davenport Consent Form, #9 Eddie Fair III Consent Form, #10 Karen Foster Consent Form, #11 Brandon France Consent Form, #12 Angel Gonzalez Consent Form, #13 Michael Harris Consent Form, #14 Selena Marie Hernandez Consent Form, #15 Michael Hodges Consent Form, #16 James E. Jones Consent Form, #17 Juliet King Consent Form, #18 Christopher Latimer Consent Form, #19 Thomas Mattingly Consent Form, #20 Thomas Jason Mattingly Consent Form, #21 Terry L. Meyer Consent Form, #22 Jarrod Mosley Consent Form, #23 Thomas Nejvara Consent Form, #24 Babatunde Okanlawon Consent Form, #25 Joshua M. Pickett Consent Form, #26 Taylor Pickett Consent Form, #27 Alejandro Ramirez Consent Form, #28 Andrew M. Ramirez Consent Form, #29 Joshua Steven Rogers Consent Form, #30 Michael Sandrock Consent Form, #31 Beau Santus Consent Form, #32 Timmerly Savage Consent Form, #33 Tevin Shoemaker Consent Form, #34 Jesse Skipper Jr. Consent Form, #35 Jacob Stacy Consent Form, #36 Gary L. Strong Consent Form, #37 Daniel Suto Jr. Consent Form, #38 Angela Wiggins Consent Form, #39 LaKesha N. Williams Consent Form, #40 Lisa Williams Consent Form, #41 Deborah Willis Consent Form, #42 Mychelle Woods Consent Form, #43 Stanly Young Consent Form)(Fischer, Alanna)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Order. [non-document] Telephone Status Conference set for 10/13/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge James R. Knepp II. The conference will convene on the Court's bridge line with dial-in access information to be provided to counsel in advance of the call. Judge James R. Knepp II on 8/19/2021. (S,JM)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Stipulation & Order approving Notice and Notice Procedure. Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/23/2021. (S,JM)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Joint Proposed Stipulation Regarding Notice and Notice Procedure filed by Kelly Butler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Notice to Class)Related document(s) #27 .(Christy, Chastity)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Attorney Appearance by Alanna B. Klein Fischer filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Fischer, Alanna)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Plaintiff's #20 Motion for Conditional Certification is GRANTED in part. The parties shall confer and jointly file a proposed notice, proposed interrogatory, and proposed notice procedure within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/8/2021. (S,JM)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Order. [non-document] The Telephone Status Conference set for 7/14/2021 is VACATED. Joint Status Report with proposed Case Management Schedule due by 8/9/2021. Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/8/2021. (S,JM)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Order. [non-document] In view of the pending #20 Motion for Conditional Certification, the Joint Status Report deadline of 6/30/2021 (per #18 ) is VACATED. Judge James R. Knepp II on 6/30/2021. (S,JM)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Reply in support of #20 Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Kelly Butler. (Christy, Chastity)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Opposition to #20 Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Adient US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Carlise Jones (Northwood), #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Jim Smith (West Point), #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Anna DeWeese (Georgetown), #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Sydney McNinch (Murfreesboro), #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Keith Knox (Sycamore), #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Terri Sharp (Columbia), #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Steven Shelton (Greenfield), #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Tiffini Reed (Pulaski), #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Maria Elena Noemi (Athens), #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Christina Casselman (Battle Creek), #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Judy Benson (Clanton), #12 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Deb Wasmer (Eldon), #13 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Fabiola Dussia (Lakewood), #14 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Nelia Agee (Lexington), #15 Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Daphne Wallace (Riverside))(Lewis, John)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #24 Motion to Exceed Page Limitations in Response to Plaintiff's #20 Motion for Conditional Certification. Judge James R. Knepp II on 5/14/2021. (S,JM)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Motion for leave to exceed page limitations for Its Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification filed by Defendant Adient US LLC. Related document(s) #20 , #23 . (Lewis, John)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Supplement to Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs - Supplement to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs, filed by Kelly Butler. Related document(s) #20 . (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Exhibit 3 - Additional Opt-In Declarations)(Christy, Chastity)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Kelly Butler. (Attachments: #1 Willie Preston Consent Form, #2 Alexzandreya Woodbury Consent Form)(Griffin, Lori)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Kelly Butler. (Attachments: #1 Kenneth Larkin Consent Form)(Griffin, Lori)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiff Kelly Butler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Consent of Kelly Butler, #3 Opt-In Declarations, #4 Discovery to Defendant, #5 Proposed Notice to Class, #6 Proposed Text Notice)(Christy, Chastity)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Kelly Butler. (Attachments: #1 Juanita Askew Consent Form, #2 Jo Atkins Consent Form, #3 Mark Cooper Consent Form, #4 Somer Courtney Consent Form, #5 Jason Eastridge Consent Form, #6 Anne Gallina Consent Form, #7 Nixi Hernandez Consent Form, #8 Toshiba Person Consent Form, #9 Tomika Roby Consent Form, #10 Taylor Whitt Consent Form)(Griffin, Lori)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Case Management Conference Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties shall exchange Rule 26(a) disclosures by 5/14/2021. Joint Status Report regarding case schedule due by 6/30/2021. Telephone Status Conference set for 7/14/2021 at 01:00 PM before Judge James R. Knepp II. The conference will convene on the Court's bridge line with dial-in access information to be provided to counsel in advance of the call. Defendant shall have 30 days to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Class Certification; Plaintiff shall have 14 days from response to file reply. Judge James R. Knepp II on 4/13/2021. (S,JM)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Minutes of Case Management Conference [non-document] held telephonically on 4/13/2021 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Attorney Chastity L. Christy attended for Plaintiff; Attorneys John B. Lewis, Randall S. Thompson, and Laura Malugade for Defendant. Case Management Conference Order to follow. Time: 25 minutes. (S,JM)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Kelly Butler. (Christy, Chastity)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Case Management Conference Notice. Case Management Conference to be held telephonically on 4/13/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge James R. Knepp II. The conference will convene on the Court's bridge line with dial-in access information to be provided to counsel in advance of the call. Judge James R. Knepp II on 3/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting) (S,JM)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Adient US LLC. Related document(s) #14 . (Lewis, John)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 First Amended complaint against Adient US LLC. Filed by Kelly Butler. (Christy, Chastity)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Memorandum Opinion and Order. It is ORDERED that Defendant's #8 Motion to Dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Judge James R. Knepp II on 2/10/2021. (S,JM)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #11 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Laura Malugade for Adient US LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge James R. Knepp II on 2/10/2021. (S,JM)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Reply in support of #8 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim or Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Adient US LLC. (Lewis, John)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion for attorney Laura Malugade to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10622428, filed by Defendant Adient US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certification for Laura Malugade (certificate does not contain an original signature), #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Laura Malugade)(Lewis, John) Modified text on 2/5/2021 (M,TL).
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #10 Motion for Extension of Time until 2/5/2021 to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Judge James R. Knepp II on 1/28/2021. (S,JM)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until February 5, 2021 to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Adient US LLC. Related document(s) #9 . (Lewis, John)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Opposition to #8 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim or Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Kelly Butler. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint)(Christy, Chastity)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim or Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Adient US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Declaration of David C. Hertel, #3 Exhibit A to Hertel Declaration Decision Letter from NLRB, #4 Exhibit B to Hertel Declaration Deferral Request Letter, #5 Exhibit C to Hertel Declaration Public Docket, #6 Exhibit D to Hertel Declaration Collective Bargaining Notice Data)(Lewis, John)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to District Judge James R. Knepp II pursuant to General Order 2020-26. (B,JL)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion for attorney Randall S. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10460717, filed by Defendant Adient US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lewis, John)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Adient US LLC answer due 12/15/2020. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/1/2020.(S,AL)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Randall S. Thompson for Adient US LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #7 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/1/2020.(S,AL)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion for extension of time until December 15, 2020 to answer or respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Adient US LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Lewis, John)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Adient US LLC answer due 11/30/2020. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/19/2020.(S,AL)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until November 30, 2020 to file responsive pleading filed by Defendant Adient US LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Lewis, John)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Adient US LLC on 10/26/2020, filed on behalf of Kelly Butler. Related document(s) #2 . (L,Br)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Adient US LLC (Receipt # 7017 3040 0000 6033 4518) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (L,Br)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Kelly Butler. (Attachments: #1 Lazetta Bagner Consent Form, #2 Kelly Butler Consent Form, #3 Antonio Dunbar Consent Form)(Griffin, Lori)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Adient US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Adient US LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10349031.. Filed by Kelly Butler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Adient US LLC) (Griffin, Lori)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Adient US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Butler
Represented By: Anthony J. Lazzaro
Represented By: Lori M. Griffin
Represented By: Chastity L. Christy
Represented By: Alanna B. Klein Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adient US LLC
Represented By: Lauren T. Stuy
Represented By: John B. Lewis
Represented By: Randall S. Thompson
Represented By: Laura Malugade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?