Campton v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Melinda Campton
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02464
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Case reassigned to District Judge James R. Knepp II pursuant to General Order 2020-26. (B,JL)
November 11, 2020 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Melinda Campton. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC waiver sent on 11/2/2020, answer due 1/1/2021 filed on behalf of Melinda Campton (Hilton, Jonathan)
November 2, 2020 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
November 2, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
November 2, 2020 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10387573.. Filed by Melinda Campton. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hilton, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campton v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Campton
Represented By: Jonathan Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?