Vercellotti v. Energizer Auto Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Claudia Vercellotti and Claudia Y. Vercellotti
Defendant: Lifeworks Technologis, Meijer Stores, John Doe 1-20, Energizer Holdings Inc., Meijers Inc., Meijer Group Inc., Meijer Distributions Inc., Energizer Auto Inc., Lifeworks Technology Group, LLC, John Doe, Meijer Inc. and Meijer Stores Limited Partnership
Case Number: 3:2021cv00006
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 NOTICE [non-document]. At the request of counsel, the Phone Status set for 2/25/21 is vacated and reset for 3/12/21 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Phone Status held on 1/26/2021. The only properly named Defendant in the Complaint is Energizer Auto, Inc. With agreement of counsel, all other named Defendants are dismissed, without prejudice, and the Clerk is instructed to add as Defendants Lifeworks Technology Group, LLC and Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. All Defendants are represented by the same counsel. Counsel shall complete Rule 26(a) disclosures and continue settlement efforts. Plaintiff shall provide medical documentation (if any) supporting her claim for damages. Further Phone Status scheduled for Thursday, February 25, 2021 at 1:30 PM. Counsel shall use the same District Court conference line. In the interim, all legal filings are stayed. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/27/2021. (20 mins)(D,L)
January 25, 2021 Filing 13 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Energizer Auto Inc., Energizer Holdings Inc., Lifeworks Technologis. (Silk, James)
January 14, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lifeworks Technologis. (Silk, James)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Phone Status held on 1/14/21. Counsel shall meet and confer to discuss whether all Defendants and all claims are appropriate. Follow-up Phone Status with counsel set for 1/26/21 at 2:00 PM. Counsel shall use the same District Court conference line. All filings are stayed until further Order of this Court. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/14/21. (S,Na)
January 14, 2021 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 1/14/21 at 2:00 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
January 13, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney W. Charles Curley of Weston Hurd LLP and adding attorney James P. Silk, Jr filed by on behalf of Energizer Auto Inc., Energizer Holdings Inc., Lifeworks Technologis, Meijer Distributions Inc., Meijer Group Inc., Meijer Inc., Meijer Stores, Meijers Inc.. (Silk, James)
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Jan L. Roller and Attorney In Son J. Loving and adding attorney James P. Silk, Jr filed by on behalf of Energizer Auto Inc., Energizer Holdings Inc., Lifeworks Technologis. (Silk, James)
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 Motion for extension of time until January 25, 2021 to answer filed by Energizer Auto Inc., Energizer Holdings Inc., Lifeworks Technologis. (Silk, James)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Meijer Distributions Inc., Meijer Group Inc., Meijer Inc., Meijer Stores, Meijers Inc.. (Curley, W.)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Meijer Distributions Inc., Meijer Group Inc., Meijer Inc., Meijer Stores, Meijers Inc.. (Curley, W.)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time until 1/25/2021 to Answer. Defendants Lifeworks Technology Group, LLC, Meijers, Inc., and Energizer Holdings, Inc. and Energizer Auto, Inc. - Answer now due 1/25/2021. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/11/2021.(D,L)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Energizer Holdings Inc.. (Loving, In Son)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Energizer Holdings, Inc. for Energizer Auto Inc. filed by Energizer Auto Inc.. (Loving, In Son)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by In Son J. Loving filed by on behalf of Energizer Auto Inc., Energizer Holdings Inc.. (Loving, In Son)
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/5/2021. (M,L)
January 5, 2021 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lucas County Common Pleas Court, case number G-4801-CI-0202003664-000 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10540745.. Filed by Meijer Inc., Meijer Stores, Meijer Distributions Inc., Lifeworks Technologis, Meijer Group Inc., Meijers Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LCCP Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - LCCP Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Silk, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vercellotti v. Energizer Auto Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifeworks Technologis
Represented By: James P. Silk, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijer Stores
Represented By: James P. Silk, Jr.
Represented By: W. Charles Curley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energizer Holdings Inc.
Represented By: James P. Silk, Jr.
Represented By: In Son J. Loving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijers Inc.
Represented By: James P. Silk, Jr.
Represented By: W. Charles Curley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijer Group Inc.
Represented By: James P. Silk, Jr.
Represented By: W. Charles Curley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijer Distributions Inc.
Represented By: James P. Silk, Jr.
Represented By: W. Charles Curley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energizer Auto Inc.
Represented By: James P. Silk, Jr.
Represented By: In Son J. Loving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifeworks Technology Group, LLC
Represented By: James P. Silk, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijer Inc.
Represented By: James P. Silk, Jr.
Represented By: W. Charles Curley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijer Stores Limited Partnership
Represented By: James P. Silk, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Vercellotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Y. Vercellotti
Represented By: Linda N. Mansour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?