Tillman v. Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Krystal Tillman
Defendant: Officer J. Goetz and Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00123
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 15 Acknowledgement of receipt of Order for Remand received and filed in Lucas County Court of Common Pleas on 3/5/2021. Related document(s) #14 . (M,L)
March 3, 2021 Certified copy of order of remand and docket sheet mailed to Lucas County Court of Common Pleas with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. Related document(s) #14 . (M,L) Modified text on 3/8/2021 (M,L).
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order of Remand to Lucas County Court of Common Pleas. Judge James R. Knepp II on 3/2/2021. (S,JM)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order and Notice of Dismissal of Officer J. Goetz with prejudice. Related document(s) #9 . Judge James R. Knepp II on 3/2/2021. (S,JM)
March 2, 2021 Filing 12 Response to Plaintiff's Notice and Consent to Dismissal filed by Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.. Related document(s) #11 .(Ebersole, Lidia)
March 2, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) notice regarding amount in dispute is below $75,000.00 filed by Krystal Tillman. (Tolliver, Lafe)
March 1, 2021 Filing 10 Statement in Support of Alternative Jurisdiction filed by Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.. Related document(s) #9 .(Ebersole, Lidia)
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Dismissal of Police Officer J. Goetz and Intention to Pursue State Claims against Named Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc., as Filed in Local Common Pleas Court filed by Krystal Tillman. (Tolliver, Lafe)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Dollar Tree, Inc. for Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. filed by Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.. (Ebersole, Lidia)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Christopher E. Cotter filed by on behalf of Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.. (Cotter, Christopher)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Tillman v. Family Dollar, Lucas County Common Pleas Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed in Lucas County Common Pleas Court Case No. G-4801-0202002532-000)(Ebersole, Lidia)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Lidia B. Ebersole filed by on behalf of Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.. (Ebersole, Lidia)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Removal refiled to allow payment of filing fee by credit card. Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10586388. Filed by Officer J. Goetz. (Green, Merritt) Modified text on 1/21/2021 (M,L).
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Officer J. Goetz. Related document(s) #1 . (Green, Merritt)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,L)
January 19, 2021 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a correctly formatted Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without being able to open the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court. Related document(s) #1 . (M,L)
January 19, 2021 Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (M,L)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lucas County Common Pleas, case number CI 2020-2532 with jury demand, . Filing fee exempt. Filed by Officer J. Goetz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Green, Merritt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillman v. Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Tillman
Represented By: Lafe E. Tolliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer J. Goetz
Represented By: Merritt W. Green, III
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Charles
Represented By: Dale R. Emch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.
Represented By: Lidia B. Ebersole
Represented By: Christopher E. Cotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?