Cook v. Mr. Walters et al
Plaintiff: Johnnie D. Cook
Defendant: Mr. Walters, Mr. Robinson, Director Annette Chambers-Smith, Warden Harold May and Ohio Attorney Genera Mike Dewine
Case Number: 3:2021cv00355
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Copy of docket mailed to Johnnie D. Cook, 591-270 at Toledo Correctional Institution, 2001 East Central Avenue, Toledo, OH 43608 on 2/12/2021. (S,DM)
February 12, 2021 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 Complaint against Mike Dewine, Mr. Robinson, Mr. Walters, Annettee Chambers-Smith, Warden May. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Johnnie D. Cook. (M,L)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:21-cv-00598. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER transferring case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, Western Division at Toledo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/11/2021. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/12/2021.]
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Johnnie D Cook. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 USM 285 forms, #5 Envelope) (mdr) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/12/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Mr. Walters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Annette Chambers-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Harold May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Attorney Genera Mike Dewine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?