Korzec v. GEM Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paul Korzec
Defendant: GEM Inc, Local 50 Northwestern Ohio Plumbers and Pipefitters, Local 50, United Association Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada and GEM Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00453
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Paul L. Cordell filed by on behalf of Local 50, United Association Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada. (Cordell, Paul)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Lindsey K. Self filed by on behalf of GEM Inc.. (Self, Lindsey)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Heidi N. Hartman filed by on behalf of GEM Inc.. (Hartman, Heidi)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon GEM Inc. and Local 50, United Association Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada. (K,AR)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 Complaint with jury demand Corrected against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10680521 (previously paid). Filed by Paul Korzec. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Riek, F.) Modified on 3/9/2021 (M,L).
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Order: [non-document] On review of the complaint filed on 2/26/2021 (Doc. 1), it appears that the complaint is incomplete. It is hereby ordered that the completed complaint to be filed on or before 4/1/2021. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint without prejudice. Judge James G. Carr on 3/5/2021. (D,TM)
March 1, 2021 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Completed Summons were not provided and were not issued. (M,L)
March 1, 2021 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court. Related document(s) #1 . (M,L)
March 1, 2021 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (M,L)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand (unsigned) against Local 50, United Association Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada and GEM Inc. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10680521. Filed by Paul Korzec. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet-Blank Form Uploaded, #2 Summons-Blank Form Uploaded, #3 Summons-Blank Form Uploaded) (Riek, F.) Modified to note blank PDF fillable forms uploaded and Complaint unsigned with no signature block on 2/26/2021 (M,L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Korzec v. GEM Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Korzec
Represented By: F. Benjamin Riek, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEM Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 50 Northwestern Ohio Plumbers and Pipefitters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 50, United Association Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada
Represented By: Paul L. Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEM Inc.
Represented By: Heidi N. Hartman
Represented By: Lindsey K. Self
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?