Last Chance Funding, Inc. v. Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Last Chance Funding, Inc.
Defendant: Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr. and Rocking A Cattle LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01090
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Filing 29 Marginal Entry Order granting #27 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Ashlee Colonna Cohen for Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER [non-document] approving #28 April 22, 2022 Status Update. Further Joint Status Report due by Tuesday, July 5, 2022. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/25/2022. (V,S)
April 22, 2022 Filing 28 Status Report filed by Last Chance Funding, Inc.. (Kopcho, Nicholas)
April 19, 2022 Filing 27 Motion for attorney Ashlee Colonna Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 34660013030, filed by Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(K,AR)
April 6, 2022 Filing 26 Notice of Filing of Letter filed by Sharon Agler. (Attachments: #1 IRS Correspondence, #2 Allen County Common Pleas Documents, #3 Allen County Sheriff's Deed, #4 Envelope)(H,JL)
April 4, 2022 Filing 25 Status Report filed by Last Chance Funding, Inc.. (Kopcho, Nicholas)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. Telephone Conference held on March 9, 2022. This Court granted Mitchell's withdrawal as counsel for Defendant Sharon Agler #23 . Counsel shall confirm withdrawal with his client in writing, advising her of this Order and that substitute counsel must enter an appearance by Friday, April 15, 2022. This Court will permit counsel for the four above-mentioned LLC Defendants to file a notice of appearance by Friday, April 15, 2022. If the LLC Defendants do not have counsel at that time, this Court will entertain a motion for default judgment. Individual Defendants Sharon Agler and Tom Agler may proceed pro se, but only if they file a Notice to that effect. If they do nothing, this Court will entertain a motion for default judgment against them as well. Counsel shall file a brief Joint Status Report, including the status of related state court litigation by Friday, April 22, 2022. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/11/2022. (20 mins)(V,S)
March 11, 2022 Copy of #24 mailed to Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, dba Tom Agler Livestock, c/o Tom Agler Sr., Registered Agent, 1895 N. Defiance Trail, Spencerville, OH 45887; Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC, dba Tom Agler Livestock, c/o Tom Agler Sr., Registered Agent, 1895 N. Defiance Trail, Spencerville, OH 45887; Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, c/o Tom Agler Sr., Registered Agent, 11530 Zion Church Rd., Spencerville, OH 45887; Tom Agler Sr., 11530 Zion Church Rd., Spencerville, OH 45887; Sharon Agler, 11530 Zion Church Rd., Spencerville, OH 45887; Rocking A Cattle LLC, c/o United States Corporation Agents, Inc., 411 Wolf Ledges Parkway, Suite 201, Akron, OH 44311 on 3/11/2022. (D,L)
March 9, 2022 IMPORTANT: NOTICE [non-document] of Telephone Conference re Motion to Withdraw as Counsel #23 set for TODAY, 3/9/2022 at 1:45 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. This Court will initiate the call. (V,S)
March 4, 2022 Filing 23 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Matthew M. Mitchell (Mitchell, Matthew) Modified on 3/8/2022 (K,AR).
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER [non-document] approving #22 Joint Status Report. Further Joint Status Report due April 4, 2022. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/5/2022. (V,S)
January 4, 2022 Filing 22 Joint Status Report by all Parties filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kopcho, Nicholas)
November 9, 2021 Copy of #21 mailed to Tom Agler, Sr. at 11530 Zion Church Rd., Spencerville, OH 45887 on 11/9/2021. (D,L)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. Phone Status held on 11/5/21. After discussion, it was agreed that this action should be stayed pending resolution of related litigation. See attached Order for detail. Counsel shall file brief Joint Status Reports every 90 days beginning on 1/4/22. Counsel may call Chambers and arrange for a conference call if and when needed. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/8/21. (S,Na)
November 5, 2021 NOTICE [non-document] of Phone Status set for 11/5/21 at 3:30 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
October 29, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Counsel filed by Sharon Agler. (Mitchell, Matthew)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. Phone Status held on 9/24/21. Defendants' Motion to Withdraw (Doc. #18 ) is found well-taken and granted. Defense counsel shall confirm withdrawal with his clients in writing, advising them that substitute counsel must enter an appearance by 11/1/21. Case Management Conference set for 10/4/21 is vacated to be rescheduled. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/27/21. (S,Na)
September 22, 2021 NOTICE [non-document] of Phone Status re Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Doc. #18 ) set for 9/24/21 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
September 21, 2021 Filing 18 Motion by Adam J. Motycka and Eric R. Neuman to withdraw as attorney filed by Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. (Motycka, Adam)
September 21, 2021 Filing 17 Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26 filed by Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. (Motycka, Adam)
September 20, 2021 Filing 16 Initial Disclosures of Plaintiff Last Chance Funding filed by Last Chance Funding, Inc.. (Kopcho, Nicholas)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER [non-document]. Joint Motion to Continue Case Management Conference (CMC) (Doc. #15 ) granted. 8/23/21 CMC vacated and reset for 10/4/21 at 3:00 PM at Chambers 203 before Judge Jack Zouhary. Counsel and parties shall attend in person. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/18/21. (S,Na)
August 13, 2021 Filing 15 Joint Motion to continue Case Management Scheduling Conference filed by Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. Related document(s) #12 . (Motycka, Adam)
August 2, 2021 Filing 14 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. (Motycka, Adam)
July 20, 2021 Filing 13 Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice. CMC to be held on Monday, August 23, 2021 at 11:00 AM in Room 203, Ashley Courthouse, 1716 Spielbusch Avenue, Toledo, Ohio. Counsel and parties shall attend in person. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/20/2021. (D,L)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Phone Status held on 7/19/202121. This Court discussed with counsel the background of this case. Counsel shall complete Rule 26(a) initial disclosures. An in-person (counsel and clients) Case Management Conference (CMC) is set for Monday, August 23, 2021 at 11:00 AM (EDT). A CMC Notice will be filed simultaneously with this Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/20/2021. (D,L)
July 7, 2021 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 7/19/21 at 1:00 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. This Court will initiate the call. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER [non-document] granting Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Move, Plead or Answer (Doc. #11 ). Answer due 8/2/21. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/30/21. (S,Na)
June 29, 2021 Filing 11 Motion for extension of time until 07/30/2021 to answer Complaint of Last Chance Funding, Inc. filed by Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Motycka, Adam)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC on 6/8/2021, filed on behalf of Last Chance Funding, Inc. (K,AR)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Agler Livestock Trucking LLC on 6/8/2021; Rocking A Cattle LLC on 6/7/2021; Sharon Agler on 6/8/2021; Tom Agler Livestock, LLC on 6/8/2021; Tom Agler Sr. on 6/8/2021, filed on behalf of Last Chance Funding, Inc. (K,AR)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order of Attachment granting #3 Motion for Prejudgment Attachment Without A Hearing Under R.C. 2715.03 and 2715.045. See Order for details. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/4/2021.(D,L)
June 3, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Agler Livestock Trucking LLC (7020 1810 0001 7878 3506), Rocking A Cattle LLC (7020 1810 0001 7878 3476), Sharon Agler (7020 1810 0001 7878 3483), Tom Agler Livestock, LLC (7020 1810 0001 7878 3674), Tom Agler Sr. (7020 1810 0001 7878 3490), Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC (7020 1810 0001 7878 3681) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. (M,L)
May 28, 2021 Filing 7 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. (M,L)
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Kopcho, Nicholas)
May 28, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kopcho, Nicholas)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Prejudgment Attachment Without A Hearing Under R.C. 2715.03 and 2715.045 filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #3 . (Kopcho, Nicholas)
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for Prejudgment Attachment Without A Hearing Under R.C. 2715.03 and 2715.045 filed by Plaintiff Last Chance Funding, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Kopcho, Nicholas)
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, therefore no summons issued. (L,Ja)
May 27, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint for Breach of Contract, Conversion and Intent to Defraud Under the Uniform Fraudulent Transfer Act R.C. 1336.04 against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402.00 Receipt number AOHNDC-10856130. Filed by Last Chance Funding, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Pleading Motion for Prejudgment, #3 Affidavit) (Kopcho, Nicholas)
May 27, 2021 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (L,Ja)
May 27, 2021 Notice by Clerk that Last Chance Funding, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,Ja)
May 27, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (L,Ja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Last Chance Funding, Inc. v. Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agler Livestock Trucking LLC
Represented By: Adam J. Motycka
Represented By: Eric R. Neuman
Represented By: Ashlee Colonna Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Agler Livestock, LLC
Represented By: Adam J. Motycka
Represented By: Eric R. Neuman
Represented By: Ashlee Colonna Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Agler
Represented By: Adam J. Motycka
Represented By: Eric R. Neuman
Represented By: Matthew M. Mitchell
Represented By: Ashlee Colonna Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC
Represented By: Adam J. Motycka
Represented By: Eric R. Neuman
Represented By: Ashlee Colonna Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Agler Sr.
Represented By: Adam J. Motycka
Represented By: Eric R. Neuman
Represented By: Ashlee Colonna Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocking A Cattle LLC
Represented By: Adam J. Motycka
Represented By: Eric R. Neuman
Represented By: Ashlee Colonna Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Last Chance Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Kopcho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?