KCS Contracting, LLC v. City of Perrysburg Ohio et al
Plaintiff: KCS Contracting and KCS Contracting, LLC
Defendant: Kathryn Sandretto, Tom Mackin, The City of Perrysburg Ohio c/o Kathryn Sandretto and City of Perrysburg Ohio
Case Number: 3:2021cv01219
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Defendants' Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by City of Perrysburg Ohio, Tom Mackin, Kathryn Sandretto. (Choka, Byron)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Parties to file a further joint status report by 9/17/21. Counsel to contact my chambers if a referral to the Magistrate Judge is desired in assisting with settlement discussions. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 7/29/2021. (S,AL)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint Status Report filed by KCS Contracting, LLC. (Kelly, Sean)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Case Management Conference Order: Case is assigned to the standard track. Deadline for amending pleadings and adding parties: July 31, 2021. Plaintiff Rule 26(a) disclosures: August 25, 2021. Defendant Rule 26(a) disclosures: September 8, 2021. Fact discovery: December 31, 2021.Plaintiff's disclosure report(s): November 1, 2021.Defendant's disclosure report(s): December 1, 2021. The parties shall submit a joint status report regarding the status of preliminary settlement discussions by July 23, 2021. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 7/14/2021. (S,AL)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint Status Report filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kelly, Sean)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Judgment Entry: For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion and Order filed concurrently, Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order is denied. (Doc. No. 1-5). The parties shall file a joint status report by July 7, 2021. This status report should address whether KCS wishes to pursue a preliminary injunction and expedited discovery in light of my ruling on the motion for a temporary restraining order. If KCS does seek to proceed with these pending motions, the status report should propose a briefing schedule for those motions. re #10 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/30/2021. (S,AL)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order is denied. (Doc. No. 1-5). The parties shall file a joint status report by July 7, 2021. This status report should address whether KCS wishes to pursue a preliminary injunction and expedited discovery in light of my ruling on the motion for a temporary restraining order. If KCS does seek to proceed with these pending motions, the status report should propose a briefing schedule for those motions. re #1 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/30/2021. (S,AL)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by KCS Contracting, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Nykulak, Nick)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order of Telephone Conference held on 6/28/2021. Plaintiff shall file a reply in support of its pending motion for a temporary restraining order by 5:00 p.m. EST on June 29, 2021, should it wish to do so. All responsive deadlines are stayed until further order of the court. Time: 10 minutes. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/28/2021. (S,AL)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Manually filed Exhibits to #5 Opposition to Plaintiff's Temporary Restraining Order - Affidavit of Kathryn Sandretto. 1 DVD on file in Clerk's office. Related document(s) #6 , #1 , #5 . (M,L)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Supplement Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibits A, B, E, F, G, and H to #5 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Affidavit of Kathryn Sandretto filed by All Defendants. Related document(s).(Choka, Byron) Modified text on 6/25/2021 (M,L).
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #1-5) and Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #1-7) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bridgette Kabat, #2 Affidavit of Kathryn Sandretto) Related document(s) #1 , #3 . (Choka, Byron) Modified text on 6/25/2021 (M,L).
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon City of Perrysburg Ohio, Tom Mackin and Kathryn Sandretto. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,DM)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (S,DM)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order On June 22, 2021, I conducted a telephone status conference. Pursuant to the discussion, Defendants shall file a written response to the pending motion for a temporary restraining order by the end of the week. Another telephone status conference will be held on June 28, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel to call bridge line at 877-411-9748, access code 1231873. (H,JL)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by KCS Contracting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons City of Perrysburg, #2 Summons Tom Mackin, #3 Summons Kathryn Sandretto)(Nykulak, Nick)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (M,L)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Wood County Common Pleas, case number 2021CV0239 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10893476. Filed by Kathryn Sandretto, Tom Mackin, City of Perrysburg Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A -State Court Party Info, #3 Exhibit B-Verified Complaint for Injunctive, Declaratory and Other Relief, #4 Exhibit C-Instructions for Service, #5 Exhibit D-Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #6 Exhibit E-Certificate of Attorney, #7 Exhibit F-Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 Exhibit G-Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery, #9 Exhibit H-Memorandum of Law Regarding Bond Requirements, #10 Exhibit I-Instructions for Service, #11 Exhibit J-Wood County Praecipe to Clerk for Service, #12 Exhibit K-Wood County Civil Case Designation Form) (Choka, Byron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KCS Contracting, LLC v. City of Perrysburg Ohio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Sandretto
Represented By: Byron S. Choka
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Mackin
Represented By: Byron S. Choka
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Perrysburg Ohio c/o Kathryn Sandretto
Represented By: Byron S. Choka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Perrysburg Ohio
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Represented By: Byron S. Choka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KCS Contracting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KCS Contracting, LLC
Represented By: Nick A. Nykulak
Represented By: Sean S. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?