Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., Ltd. et al v. D&B Sales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., Ltd. and First 2 Market Products, LLC
Defendant: D&B Sales, Inc., Dale Irwin and Bobbi Irwin
Case Number: 3:2021cv01448
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 9/13/2021. Counsel are discussing a potential early resolution. Counsel shall file a brief Joint Status Report by Monday, October 25, 2021, indicating whether they have resolved or wish to dismiss this case, or wish to talk further with this Court. Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/14/2021. (15 mins)(D,L)
August 19, 2021 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 9/13/21 at 9:00 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. This Court will initiate the call. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Defendants. (Lech, Robert)
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Robert R. Lech filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Lech, Robert)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Bobbi Irwin on 7/27/2021, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s) #1 . (Strup, David)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Dale Irwin on 7/27/2021, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s) #1 . (Strup, David)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service by personal service executed upon D&B Sales, Inc. on 7/27/2021, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s) #1 . (Strup, David)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/27/2021. (M,L)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon D&B Sales, Inc., Bobbi Irwin, Dale Irwin. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Strup, David)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Strup, David)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10952579.. Filed by Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., Ltd., First 2 Market Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit United States Patent, #2 Exhibit Exclusive Distribution Agreement, #3 Exhibit Photos of Gripstic packaging, #4 Exhibit Defendants' bag sealing devices, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #6 Summons D&B Sales, Inc. summons, #7 Summons D. Irwin summons, #8 Summons B. Irwin summons) (Strup, David)
July 27, 2021 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
July 27, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (M,L)
July 27, 2021 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L)
July 27, 2021 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (M,L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., Ltd. et al v. D&B Sales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Michael E. Dockins
Represented By: David P. Strup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First 2 Market Products, LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Dockins
Represented By: David P. Strup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&B Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R. Lech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Irwin
Represented By: Robert R. Lech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbi Irwin
Represented By: Robert R. Lech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?