Gideon v. Treglia
Petitioner: James A Gideon
Respondent: Lima Municipal Court and Sheriff Matthew B. Treglia
Case Number: 3:2021cv02087
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: William H Baughman
Referring Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation: For good cause appearing, the Petitioner's #10 Objections to the #7 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge re #4 Emergency Motion for Bond Pending Adjudication of Petition are OVERRULED; and therefore the Petitioner's #4 Emergency Motion for Bond is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Petitioner's #11 Motion for Conference or Hearing is DENIED. Judge James R. Knepp II on 12/21/2021. (B,JL)
December 17, 2021 Filing 17 Sur-Reply to Petitioner's Reply regarding Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation filed by Matthew B. Treglia. Related document(s) #14 . (Fosnaught, Jerri)
December 17, 2021 Filing 16 Supplement to Return of Writ (2254), - (State Court Record - Exhibits 124-127 bookmarked), filed by Matthew B. Treglia. Related document(s) #15 . (Fosnaught, Jerri)
December 16, 2021 Filing 15 Return of Writ (2254) #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) filed by Matthew B. Treglia. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (Exhibits 1-60 - bookmarked), #2 State Court Record (Exhibits 61-123 - bookmarked), #3 State Court Record (Trial Transcripts - bookmarked))(Fosnaught, Jerri)
December 10, 2021 Filing 14 Reply Memorandum in Support of Objections to Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge(ECF # 7) filed by James A Gideon. Related document(s) #10 . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Supplemental) (Belli, Dennis)
December 7, 2021 Filing 13 Response to Petitioners Objections to the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 10) filed by Matthew B. Treglia. Related document(s) #10 . (Fosnaught, Jerri)
December 2, 2021 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Jerri L. Fosnaught filed by on behalf of Matthew B. Treglia. (Fosnaught, Jerri)
December 2, 2021 Filing 11 Motion for conference/hearing on #10 Objections to the #7 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge filed by Petitioner James A Gideon. (Belli, Dennis)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 Objection to Report and Recommendation to Deny Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Release on Bond Pending Adjudication of Petition filed by James A Gideon. Related document(s) #7 . (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Belli, Dennis)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order to Show Cause. (Related Doc. #1 ) The respondent has 23 days from the date of this order to file an answer/return of writ. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 11/23/21. (Issued by ordinary mail to petitioner and respondent with copy of petition to respondent and via email to Attorney General Brian Higgins and Prosecutor Juergen Waldick on 11/23/21.)(M,MT)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Respondent's Motion to withdraw as attorney, Anthony M. DiPietro removed from case. (Related Doc #8 ). Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 11/23/21.(M,MT)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 Motion by Anthony M. DiPietro to withdraw as attorney and Praecipe for Service filed by Respondent Matthew B. Treglia. (DiPietro, Anthony)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 Report and Recommendation that #4 Emergency Motion for bond Pending Adjudication of Petition filed by James A. Gideon be denied. Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 12/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 11/19/21. (M,MT)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to substitute party filed by Respondent Lima Municipal Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Allen County Sheriff's Office Inmate Inquiry)(DiPietro, Anthony)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion to substitute party; Respondent originally named as Lima Municipal Court, now named as Allen County, Ohio Sheriff Matthew B. Treglia. (Related Doc #6 ) Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 11/19/21.(M,MT)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 Opposition to #4 Emergency Motion for bond Pending Adjudication of Petition filed by Lima Municipal Court. (DiPietro, Anthony)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 Emergency Motion for bond Pending Adjudication of Petition filed by Petitioner James A Gideon. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Belli, Dennis)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order to Show Cause. (Related Doc. #1 ) The respondent has 23 days from the date of this order to file an answer/return of writ. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 11/08/21. (Issued by ordinary mail to petitioner and respondent with copy of petition to respondent and via email to Anthony M. DiPietro, attorney of respondent on 11/08/21.)(M,MT)
November 5, 2021 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge James R. Knepp II on 11/5/2021. (B,JL)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (S,DM)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee paid $ 5, receipt number AOHNDC-11118136.. Filed by James A Gideon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Belli, Dennis)
November 4, 2021 Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (S,DM)
November 4, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (S,DM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gideon v. Treglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James A Gideon
Represented By: Dennis C. Belli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lima Municipal Court
Represented By: Anthony M. DiPietro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Matthew B. Treglia
Represented By: Jerri L. Fosnaught
Represented By: Anthony M. DiPietro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?