Agoura Health Products LLC et al v. Schiefelbein et al
Plaintiff: Agoura Health Products LLC doing business as Gundry MD, Pacific Health Supplements LLC doing business as NUCIFIC, Cali Pet Nutrients LLC doing business as Ultimate Pet Nutrition and Beverly Hills MD, LLC
Defendant: Aaron Schiefelbein, Anthony Holloway, LLC, H100 Holdings LLC, 0316 Ventures LLC, Gannon Med, LLC and Big Five Ventures LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv02315
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by Carrie A. Johnson filed by on behalf of 0316 Ventures LLC, Anthony Holloway, LLC, Big Five Ventures LLC, Gannon Med, LLC, H100 Holdings LLC, Aaron Schiefelbein. (Johnson, Carrie)
February 1, 2022 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Teleconference set for Tuesday, February 15, 2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line (to be provided via email). No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (V,S)
February 1, 2022 Remark by Finance. Funds in the amount of $402.00 refunded on 2/1/2022 Receipt# AOHNDC-11173160. (W,L)
January 5, 2022 Filing 12 Motion for extension of time until February 16, 2022 to answer , move, plead or otherwise respond filed by 0316 Ventures LLC, Anthony Holloway, LLC, Big Five Ventures LLC, Gannon Med, LLC, H100 Holdings LLC, Aaron Schiefelbein. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Stuart)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time until February 16, 2022 to answer. 0316 Ventures LLC, Anthony Holloway, LLC, Big Five Ventures, Gannon Med, LLC, H100 Holdings LLC, Aaron Schiefelbein - Answer now due 2/16/2022. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/5/2022.(D,L)
January 4, 2022 Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: duplicate charge. Receipt #: AOHNDC-11173160, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Krantz, Brett)
January 3, 2022 Filing 11 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Gannon Med, LLC on 12/27/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of all Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #6 . (R,EM)
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon 0316 Ventures LLC on 12/22/2021 per United States Postal Service website; Anthony Holloway, LLC on 12/20/2021 and H100 Holdings LLC on 12/23/2021, filed on behalf of Beverly Hills MD, LLC Related document(s) #6 . (S,DM)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Big Five Ventures LLC on 12/20/2021, filed on behalf of all Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #6 . (R,EM)
December 17, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to 0316 Ventures, LLC (Receipt # 7021 0350 0000 6441 2034), Anthony Holloway, LLC (Receipt # 7021 0350 0000 6441 2065), Big Five Ventures, LLC (Receipt # 7021 0350 0000 6441 2010), Gannon Med, LLC (Receipt # 7021 0350 0000 6441 2027), and H100 Holdings, LLC (Receipt # 7021 0350 0000 6441 2041) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (V,AR)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Aaron Schiefelbein on 12/15/2021, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s) #1 , #6 . (Krantz, Brett)
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Detailed Listing of Registered Trademarks)(Krantz, Brett)
December 15, 2021 Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Local Rule 3.13(c) requires the filing of the #AO121 Copyright Report Form or #AO120 Patent and Trademark Report Form by 12/22/2021. (W,Na)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon 0316 Ventures LLC, Anthony Holloway, LLC, Big Five Ventures LLC, Gannon Med, LLC, H100 Holdings LLC, Aaron Schiefelbein. (K,AR)
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons Schiefelbein, #2 Summons Anthony Holloway LLC, #3 Summons H100 Holdings LLC, #4 Summons 0316 Ventures LLC, #5 Summons Gannon Med LLC, #6 Summons Big Five Ventures LLC)(Krantz, Brett)
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 12/9/2021. (H,JL)
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No Summons issued. None Provided. (H,JL)
December 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Krantz, Brett)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number BOHNDC-11173160.. Filed by Cali Pet Nutrients LLC dba Ultimate Pet Nutrition, Pacific Health Supplements LLC dba NUCIFIC, Agoura Health Products LLC dba Gundry MD, Beverly Hills MD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trademark Registrations, #2 Exhibit Gundry MD Terms and Conditions, #3 Exhibit Nucific Terms and Conditions, #4 Exhibit UPN Terms and Conditions, #5 Exhibit Beverly Hills MD Terms and Conditions, #6 Exhibit 3.22.2019 Cease and Desist, #7 Exhibit 6.22.2020 Cease and Desist, #8 Exhibit 10.19.2020 Cease and Desist, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Krantz, Brett)
December 9, 2021 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (H,JL)
December 9, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (H,JL)
December 9, 2021 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (H,JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agoura Health Products LLC et al v. Schiefelbein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agoura Health Products LLC doing business as Gundry MD
Represented By: Brett S. Krantz
Represented By: Jonathon W. Groza
Represented By: Kyle D. Stroup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Health Supplements LLC doing business as NUCIFIC
Represented By: Brett S. Krantz
Represented By: Jonathon W. Groza
Represented By: Kyle D. Stroup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cali Pet Nutrients LLC doing business as Ultimate Pet Nutrition
Represented By: Brett S. Krantz
Represented By: Jonathon W. Groza
Represented By: Kyle D. Stroup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Hills MD, LLC
Represented By: Brett S. Krantz
Represented By: Jonathon W. Groza
Represented By: Kyle D. Stroup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Schiefelbein
Represented By: Carrie A. Johnson
Represented By: Stuart J. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Holloway, LLC
Represented By: Carrie A. Johnson
Represented By: Stuart J. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H100 Holdings LLC
Represented By: Carrie A. Johnson
Represented By: Stuart J. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0316 Ventures LLC
Represented By: Carrie A. Johnson
Represented By: Stuart J. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannon Med, LLC
Represented By: Carrie A. Johnson
Represented By: Stuart J. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Five Ventures LLC
Represented By: Carrie A. Johnson
Represented By: Stuart J. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?