McCoy v. RFS Charitable Foundation
Counter Defendant: Niki McCoy
Counter Claimant: RFS Charitable Foundation
Case Number: 3:2022cv00807
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Filing 12 Answer to Count II of Defendant's Counterclaim filed by Niki McCoy. (Dubow, Daniel)
July 8, 2022 Filing 11 Motion to dismiss count I, III-VI of Defendant's Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff Niki McCoy. (Dubow, Daniel)
June 21, 2022 Minute Order [non-document] Initial Status/scheduling conference in lieu of case management conference held by video on 6/21/2022 before Judge James G. Carr. Time: 20 Minutes. Plaintiff appeared by attorney Kevin Buryanek. Defendant appeared by attorneys Adam D. Fuller and Monica Andress. Parties advised as to case status. Case designated as Standard Track. Discovery due 7/29/2022. Initial Settlement Conference set for 9/26/2022 at 1:30 PM to be held by video conference (Toledo) before Judge James G. Carr. Video conference access information to be provided to all participants in advance of conference. Plaintiff's good faith demand shall be made not later than three weeks before the Settlement Conference. Defendant shall make a good faith response not later than two weeks before the Settlement Conference. Counsel and the parties, or in the case of an organizational party, a partys authorized representative must attend the conference. The parties and/or authorized representatives who appear for the conference must have full authority to settle the case. Each party must file a brief, double-spaced ex parte narrative statement via cm/ecf not later than ten (10) days prior to the conference. Judge James G. Carr on 6/21/2022. (D,TM)
June 17, 2022 Filing 10 Protective Order regarding confidential documents. Judge James G. Carr on 6/17/2022. (D,TM)
June 16, 2022 Filing 9 Motion for extension of time until 07/08/2022 to Move and/or otherwise Plead in Response to Defendants Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff Niki McCoy. (Dubow, Daniel)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #9 Motion for extension of time until 07/08/2022 to move and/or otherwise plead in response to Defendant's Counterclaims as unopposed. Judge James G. Carr on 6/16/2022. (D,TM)
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by RFS Charitable Foundation. (Fuller, Adam)
June 14, 2022 Filing 7 Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - filed by RFS Charitable Foundation. (Fuller, Adam)
June 14, 2022 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance of Monica B. Andress as co-counsel filed by on behalf of RFS Charitable Foundation. (Andress, Monica)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Order: [non-document] Initial Status/Scheduling Conference reset for 6/21/2022 at 09:00 AM to be held by video conference (Toledo) before Judge James G. Carr. Video conference zoom invite to issue to all participants in advance. Judge James G. Carr on 6/7/2022. (D,TM)
June 3, 2022 Filing 5 Answer of Defendant RFS Charitable Foundation, Counterclaim against Plaintiff Niki McCoy filed by RFS Charitable Foundation. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter) (Fuller, Adam)
June 3, 2022 Notice [non-document] of Initial Status Scheduling Conference set for 6/14/2022 at 02:00 PM to be held by video conference (Toledo) before Judge James G. Carr. Video conference zoom invite to issue to all participants in advance. (D,TM)
May 24, 2022 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until June 4, 2022 to answer the Amended Complaint filed by Defendant RFS Charitable Foundation. Related document(s) #1 . (Fuller, Adam)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #4 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer to the amended complaint. RFS Charitable Foundation answer due 6/6/2022. Judge James G. Carr on 5/24/2022. (D,TM)
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (R,EM)
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by RFS Charitable Foundation. (Fuller, Adam)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lucas County, OH, case number G-4801-0202201654-000 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11427173. Filed by RFS Charitable Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket, Complaint and Praecipe, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Returns of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Judgment Entry, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Appearance, #5 Exhibit E - Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Sarabia Consent of Removal, #7 Exhibit G - Bryant Consent of Removal, #8 Exhibit H - Warren Consent of Removal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fuller, Adam)
May 18, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (R,EM)
May 18, 2022 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (R,EM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. RFS Charitable Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Niki McCoy
Represented By: Daniel S. Dubow
Represented By: Kevin A. Buryanek
Represented By: Shashelia Degraffinried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: RFS Charitable Foundation
Represented By: Adrian C. Ribovich
Represented By: Adam D. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?