Borzymowski v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Steven Borzymowski
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2022cv00902
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Referring Judge: Darrell A Clay
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 31, 2022 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Commissioner of Social Security answer due 8/31/2022. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 7/26/2022.(S,DM)
July 25, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 31, 2022 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Johnson, Lisa)
June 1, 2022 Filing 4 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay for further proceedings. Related Document #3 . Judge James G. Carr on 6/1/2022. (D,TM)
June 1, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Proposed Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Asher, Ruchi)
June 1, 2022 Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay assigned to case. Pursuant to consent. Judge James G. Carr terminated. Related document(s) #4 . (S,DM)
May 31, 2022 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/31/22. (R,EM)
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11444185. Filed by Steven Borzymowski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Margolius, Marcia)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Order of Reassignment. The Clerk's Office has indicated that there was an error in the assignment of this case; therefore, it is being returned to the Clerk's Office for proper assignment. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 5/31/22. (M,SM)
May 31, 2022 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (R,EM)
May 31, 2022 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick terminated. (R,EM)
May 31, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (R,EM)
May 31, 2022 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge James G. Carr on 5/31/22. (R,EM)
May 31, 2022 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (R,EM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borzymowski v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Borzymowski
Represented By: Marcia W. Margolius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?