Morgan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lisa Morgan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2022cv00934
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Referring Judge: Amanda M Knapp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #6 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 16, 2022 for Defendant to file the Certified Administrative Record. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 7/29/2022. (P,G)
July 22, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 16, 2022 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Lisa)
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,S)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. The transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1 and this Order. Compliance with all requirements set forth in this Order is expected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 6/6/2022. (S,S)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 6/6/2022. (S,S)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/3/2022. (S,DM)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Lisa Morgan. (Wilson, Rachel)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Lisa Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilson, Rachel)
June 3, 2022 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (S,DM)
June 3, 2022 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (S,DM)
June 3, 2022 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/3/2022. (S,DM)
June 3, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (S,DM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Morgan
Represented By: Rachel C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?