Rickard v. Forshey
Petitioner: Cody Rickard
Respondent: Warden Jay Forshey
Case Number: 3:2022cv01278
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Referring Judge: Carmen E Henderson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 19, 2022 to answer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Jay Forshey. (Rosenberg, Hilda)
August 12, 2022 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Hilda Rosenberg filed by on behalf of Jay Forshey. (Rosenberg, Hilda)
July 21, 2022 Filing 9 Supplement to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254),, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Cody Rickard. Related document(s) #3 . (Croushore, Paul)
July 20, 2022 Filing 8 Civil Cover Sheet (page 1 only) filed by Cody Rickard. Related document(s) #1 . (Croushore, Paul) Modified text on 7/20/2022 (M,TL).
July 20, 2022 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Respondent shall file an Answer (Return of Writ) to the petition within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the filing of Respondent's Return of Writ to file a Reply (Traverse). Respondent shall have fifteen (15) days from the filing of Petitioner's Traverse to respond thereto. Any request for an extension of any deadline must be made at least three (3) business days before the deadline date, but such requests will not be routinely granted. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 7/20/2022. (S,KL)
July 20, 2022 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge John R. Adams on 7/20/22. (K,C)
July 20, 2022 Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) mailed to Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost at 30 E. Broad St., 14th Floor, Columbus, OH 43215; Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #6 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order and #7 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order mailed to Warden Jay Forshey at Noble Correctional Institution, 15708 McConnelsville Road, Cladwell, OH., 43724 on 7/20/2022. (S,KL)
July 19, 2022 Copy of #6 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order and docket sheet mailed to Warden Jay Forshey, Noble Correctional Institution, 15708 McConnelsville Road, Cladwell, OH 43724 on 7/19/2022. Related document(s) #6 . (M,CE)
July 19, 2022 Filing 6 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/19/2022. (M,CE)
July 19, 2022 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 1:22-cv-00407. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER transferring this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, Western Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/19/2022. (kk2) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/19/2022.]
July 19, 2022 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio, Western Division. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (kk2) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/19/2022.]
July 19, 2022 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,CE)
July 19, 2022 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Related document(s) #3 . (M,CE)
July 19, 2022 Notice to Attorney General of 2254 case transferred to Northern District of Ohio from Southern District of Ohio. (M,CE)
July 19, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,CE)
July 15, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Cody Ross Rickard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trial Day 1, #2 Exhibit Trial Day 2, #3 Exhibit Trial Day 3, #4 Exhibit Trial, Verdict, Sentencing, #5 Exhibit Sentence, #6 Exhibit Court of Appeals decision, #7 Exhibit Petition pro se, #8 Exhibit IntroTech & Ohio Crash reports, #9 Exhibit Order Dismissing, #10 Exhibit Order Dismissing, #11 Exhibit Court of Appeals decision, #12 Exhibit Ohio Supreme Court denial) (Croushore, Paul) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/19/2022.]
July 15, 2022 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 7/18/2022. (kh) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/19/2022.]
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number AOHSDC-8955474.), filed by Cody Ross Rickard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit) (Croushore, Paul) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/19/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rickard v. Forshey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cody Rickard
Represented By: Paul G. Croushore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Jay Forshey
Represented By: Hilda Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?