MCS Manufacturing LLC v. Tenneco Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MCS Manufacturing LLC
Defendant: Tenneco Inc., Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc and DRiV Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv01603
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Initial Telephone Conference held September 29, 2022. This Court reviewed with counsel the procedure for filing a motion to dismiss #11 . Counsel shall file a brief Joint Status Report by November 18, 2022 with a follow-up Video Conference with the Court on Monday, November 21, 2022 at 11 AM (EST). A Zoom invitation will be sent to counsel by email. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/3/2022. (15 mins) (V,S)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice [non-document] of Initial Telephone Conference set for Thursday, September 29, 2022 at 9:30 AM (EST) before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line provided by email. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Telephone Conference. (V,S)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Declaration in Support of #9 Motion for attorney Lillian Grappe Lamphere to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by All Defendants. (Kelley, Brendan)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Marginal Entry Order granting #9 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Lillian Grappe Lamphere for DRiV Inc., Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc, and Tenneco Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct) (V,S)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Marginal Entry Order granting #8 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Katheleen A. Ehrhart for DRiV Inc., Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc, and Tenneco Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct) (V,S)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Marginal Entry Order granting #7 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Tina C. Wills for DRiV Inc., Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc, and Tenneco Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct) (V,S)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Declaration of Katheleen A. Ehrhart in Support of #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Kelley, Brendan)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Supplement to Motion for attorney Tina C. Wills to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11608342, - Signed Declaration of Tina Wills in support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #7 . (Kelley, Brendan)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/13/2022. (H,JL)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 7, 2022 to answer or otherwise plead filed by DRiV Inc., Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc, Tenneco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelley, Brendan)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion for attorney Lillian Grappe Lamphere to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11608407, filed by DRiV Inc., Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc, Tenneco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Attorney Lamphere (document does not contain an original signature), #2 Proposed Order)(Kelley, Brendan) Modified text on 9/12/2022 (M,TL).
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion for attorney Katheleen A. Ehrhart to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11608394, filed by DRiV Inc., Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc, Tenneco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Attorney Ehrhart (document does not contain an original signature), #2 Proposed Order)(Kelley, Brendan) Modified text on 9/12/2022 (M,TL).
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion for attorney Tina C. Wills to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11608342, filed by DRiV Inc., Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc, Tenneco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Attorney Wills (document does not contain an original signature) , #2 Proposed Order)(Kelley, Brendan) Modified text on 9/12/2022 (M,TL).
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Attorney Appearance of Laura Kingsley Hong by Brendan P. Kelley filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Kelley, Brendan)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Tenneco Inc. for DRiV Inc. filed by DRiV Inc.. (Kelley, Brendan)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc. (Kelley, Brendan)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Tenneco Inc. for Tenneco Inc. filed by Tenneco Inc.. (Kelley, Brendan)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Attorney Appearance by Brendan P. Kelley filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Kelley, Brendan)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Fulton County, Ohio Court of Common Pleas, case number 22CV000133 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11607715.. Filed by Tenneco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Process, Pleadings for Tenneco Inc., Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc., and DRiV Inc.) (Kelley, Brendan)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case (H,JL)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (H,JL)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice by Clerk that Tenneco Inc., Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc., DRiV Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (H,JL)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER [non-document] granting #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Answer for all Defendants now due October 7, 2022. Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/9/2022. (V,S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCS Manufacturing LLC v. Tenneco Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCS Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: Nicholas T. Stack
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenneco Inc.
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Represented By: Tina C. Wills
Represented By: Brendan P. Kelley
Represented By: Katheleen A. Ehrhart
Represented By: Lillian Grappe Lamphere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc
Represented By: Brendan P. Kelley
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Represented By: Tina C. Wills
Represented By: Katheleen A. Ehrhart
Represented By: Lillian Grappe Lamphere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRiV Inc.
Represented By: Tina C. Wills
Represented By: Brendan P. Kelley
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Represented By: Katheleen A. Ehrhart
Represented By: Lillian Grappe Lamphere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?