Jones v. Sullivan
Petitioner: Dashay Jones
Respondent: Warden Dennis Sullivan
Case Number: 3:2022cv02135
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong
Referring Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2023 Copy of Order on Motion for extension of time to answer mailed to Dashay Jones #202001294 at Corrections Center of Northwest Ohio, 03151 County Road 24.25, Stryker, OH 43557 on 1/20/2023. (K,L)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Respondent's #6 First Motion for extension of time until March 21, 2023 to answer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong on 1/20/2023.(K,L)
January 19, 2023 Filing 6 Motion for extension of time until March 21, 2023 to answer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, with memorandum in support filed by Respondent Dennis Sullivan. (Lamb, William)
December 20, 2022 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by William H. Lamb filed by on behalf of Dennis Sullivan. (Lamb, William)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong on 12/7/2022. (K,L)
December 7, 2022 Copy of #4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order mailed to Dashay Jones #202001294 at Corrections Center of Northwest Ohio, 03151 County Road 24.25, Stryker, OH 43557 on 12/7/2022. (K,L)
December 7, 2022 Copy of #4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order mailed to Dennis Sullivan Warden at, 03151 County Road 2425, Stryker, OH 43557 on 12/7/2022. (K,L)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order. Upon consideration, and pursuant to LR 72.2 et seq, this matter is referred for a report and recommendation decision to United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong, which referral shall include the issuance by the Magistrate Judge for any order requiring the respondent to answer, service of the petition or any appropriate order directed to the matter pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure governing Habeas Corpus cases. LR 71.1(f). Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/29/2022. (R,Sh)
November 29, 2022 Copy of #2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order, #3 Order,, mailed to Dashay Jones #202001294 Corrections Center of Northwest Ohio 03151 County Road 24.25 Stryker, OH 43557 on 11/29/2022. Related document(s) #2 , #3 . (R,Sh)
November 29, 2022 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/29/2022. (R,Sh)
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/28/2022. (H,JL)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee paid 5.00. Receipt # 34660013385. Filed by Dashay Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (H,JL)
November 28, 2022 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case (H,JL)
November 28, 2022 Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) mailed to Dashay Jones #202001294 at Corrections Center of Northwest Ohio 03151 County Road 24.25 Stryker, OH 43557 on 11/28/2022. Related document(s) #1 . (H,JL)
November 28, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (H,JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dashay Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Dennis Sullivan
Represented By: William H. Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?