Fust v. MBC Holdings, Inc. , et al
Plaintiff: Kyle T Fust and Kyle T. Fust
Defendant: MBC Holdings, Inc. aka and/or dba Miller Brothers Const., Inc., Laborers' International Union of North America Local 499, Laborers' International Union of North America Local 500, Miller Brothers Construction, Inc., Local 499 Laborers' International Union of North America and Local 500 Laborers' International Union of North America
Case Number: 3:2023cv00159
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2023 Filing 14 Marginal Entry Order granting #13 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorneys Christopher P. Legghio and Megan B. Boelstler for Local 499 Laborers' International Union of North America. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct) (V,S)
March 2, 2023 Filing 13 Motion for attorney Christopher P. Legghio and Megan B. Boelstler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 240.00, receipt number 13555, filed by Defendant Local 499 Laborers' International Union of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing for Chrisopher Legghio and Megan Boelstler, #3 Envelope)(K,AR)
February 28, 2023 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Telephone Conference set for Tuesday, April 4, 2023 at 3 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line (provided by email). No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Telephone Conference. (V,S)
February 21, 2023 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Miller Brothers Construction, Inc.. Miller Brothers Construction, Inc. waiver sent on 2/17/2023, answer due 4/18/2023 filed on behalf of Miller Brothers Construction, Inc. (Shope, Rebecca)
February 19, 2023 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Kyle T. Fust. Local 499 Laborers' International Union of North America waiver sent on 2/9/2023, answer due 4/10/2023 filed on behalf of Kyle T. Fust (Landry, Francis)
February 8, 2023 Filing 10 First Amended complaint with jury demand endorsed hereon against All Defendants. Filed by Kyle T. Fust. (Landry, Francis)
February 4, 2023 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Kyle T. Fust. Local 500 Laborers' International Union of North America waiver sent on 1/30/2023, answer due 3/31/2023 filed on behalf of Kyle T. Fust (Landry, Francis)
February 3, 2023 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Austin T. Opalich filed by on behalf of Local 500 Laborers' International Union of North America. (Opalich, Austin)
February 3, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Local 500 Laborers' International Union of North America. (Hymore, Ryan)
February 3, 2023 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Ryan K. Hymore filed by on behalf of Local 500 Laborers' International Union of North America. (Hymore, Ryan)
January 31, 2023 Filing 5 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/31/2023. (S,DM)
January 31, 2023 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (S,DM)
January 30, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons (Directed to Defendant Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 499) filed by Kyle T. Fust. (Landry, Francis)
January 30, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons (Directed to Defendant MBC Holdings, Inc., etc.) filed by Kyle T. Fust. (Landry, Francis)
January 27, 2023 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided and no summons issued. (S,DM)
January 27, 2023 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (S,DM)
January 27, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (S,DM)
January 26, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11810838. Filed by Kyle T. Fust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Landry, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fust v. MBC Holdings, Inc. , et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle T Fust
Represented By: Francis J. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle T. Fust
Represented By: Francis J. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBC Holdings, Inc. aka and/or dba Miller Brothers Const., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laborers' International Union of North America Local 499
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laborers' International Union of North America Local 500
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Brothers Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca E. Shope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 499 Laborers' International Union of North America
Represented By: Christopher P. Legghio
Represented By: Megan B. Boelstler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 500 Laborers' International Union of North America
Represented By: Austin T. Opalich
Represented By: Ryan K. Hymore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?