Richard, Jr. v. Fender
Petitioner: Gregory D. Richard, Jr.
Respondent: Warden Douglas Fender
Case Number: 3:2023cv00599
Filed: March 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Bridget Meehan Brennan
Referring Judge: James E Grimes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Maura O'Neill Jaite filed by on behalf of Douglas Fender. (Jaite, Maura)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Respondent shall file an answer to the petition within 60 days from the date of this order; petitioner shall have 45 days from the filing of respondent's answer to respond; respondent shall have 15 days from the filing of petitioner's reply brief to respond. (Issued by ordinary mail to Petitioner and to Respondent, with copy of petition for writ of habeas corpus to Respondent and via email to Brian Higgins, Office of Ohio Attorney General, on 04/04/23). Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 04/04/23.(M,MT)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Petitioner's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 04/04/23.(M,MT)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (S,HR)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of #4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order mailed to Warden and Douglas Fender at Lake Erie Correctional Institution, 501 Thompson Road, Conneaut, OH 44030. (S,HR)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 3/27/2023. (H,AR)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (F,AW) Modified on 3/22/2023 - Document not uploaded. Issues with the ecf system. (L,MI).
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Application to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Gregory D. Richard, Jr. (F,AW)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Gregory D. Richard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (F,AW)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Copy of #1 Petition, 3 Administrative Track Initial Order, and blank Civil Cover Sheet mailed to Gregory D. Richard, Jr A777-855 at Lake Erie Correctional Institution, 501 Thompson Road, Conneaut, OH 44030 on 3/21/2023. Related document(s) #1 , 3 . (F,AW)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (F,AW)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (F,AW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard, Jr. v. Fender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory D. Richard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Douglas Fender
Represented By: Maura O'Neill Jaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?