Niekamp et al. v. Watts Guerra LLP et al.
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Niekamp and Randall D. Hebrink
Defendant: Watts Guerra LLP, Bassford Remele PA, Gustafson Gluek PLLC, Schwebel Goetz & Sieben PA, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare Wynn Newell & Newton LLP, Gray, Ritter & Graham PC, Reed & McGraw PC, Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Paul McInnes LLP, Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra and Gray Reed & McGraw PC
Case Number: 3:2023cv02289
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 38 Notice of Tag-Along Motion to Transfer filed by Bassford Remele PA, Francisco Guerra, Gustafson Gluek PLLC, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra LLP. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Transfer, #2 Memorandum of Law In Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer, #3 Schedule of Actions, #4 Certificate of Service and Service List, #5 Docket Sheet and Amended Class Action Complaint, #6 Amended Certificate of Service and Service List)(Goodman, Christopher)
January 26, 2024 Filing 37 Motion for attorney John W. Ursu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12377159, filed by Gray Reed & McGraw PC, Hare Wynn Newell & Newton LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of John W. Ursu)(Skow, Sarah)
January 25, 2024 Filing 36 Marginal Entry Order granting #32 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Douglas R. Dalgleish for Gray, Ritter & Graham PC and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct) (V,S)
January 25, 2024 Filing 35 Marginal Entry Order granting #31 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Courtney J. Harrison for Gray, Ritter & Graham PC and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct) (V,S)
January 25, 2024 Filing 34 Supplement Declaration to Motion for attorney Douglas R. Dalgleish to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12373505 filed by Gray, Ritter & Graham PC, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. Related document(s) #32 . (Skow, Sarah)
January 25, 2024 Filing 33 Supplemental Declaration in support of #31 Motion for attorney Courtney J. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12373493, filed by Gray, Ritter & Graham PC, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. (Skow, Sarah)
January 25, 2024 Filing 32 Motion for attorney Douglas R. Dalgleish to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12373505, filed by Gray, Ritter & Graham PC, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas R. Dalgleish)(Skow, Sarah)
January 25, 2024 Filing 31 Motion for attorney Courtney J. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12373493, filed by Gray, Ritter & Graham PC, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Courtney Harrison)(Skow, Sarah)
January 18, 2024 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Zoom Conference set for Tuesday, January 30, 2024 at 1 PM (EST) before Judge Jack Zouhary. A Zoom invitation will be sent to counsel by email. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Telephone Conference. (V,S)
January 8, 2024 Filing 30 Affidavit/Declaration of Service filed by Christopher J. Niekamp. Related document(s) #28 . (Nill, Douglas)
January 8, 2024 Filing 29 Marginal Entry Order granting #27 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Christopher L. Goodman for Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, and Watts Guerra LLP. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct) (V,S)
January 8, 2024 Filing 28 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendants Watts Guerra LLP, Bassford Remele PA, Gustafson Gluek PLLC, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Mikal C. Watts, and Francisco Guerra filed by Christopher J. Niekamp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Douglas J Nill, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Nill, Douglas)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER [non-document] denying #28 Plaintiffs' Application for Clerk's Entry of Default. See Civil Case Management Procedures, Doc. #5 at 1. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/8/2024. (V,S)
January 4, 2024 Filing 27 Motion for attorney Christopher L. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12340675, filed by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Christopher L. Goodman)(Hudson, David)
December 28, 2023 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher J. Niekamp. Hare Wynn Newell & Newton LLP waiver sent on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024 filed on behalf of Christopher J. Niekamp (Nill, Douglas)
December 28, 2023 Filing 25 Notice Of Filing Opposition To Notice Of Potential Tag-Along filed by Christopher J. Niekamp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposition To Notice Of Potential Tag-Along)Related document(s) #20 .(Nill, Douglas)
December 27, 2023 Filing 24 Marginal Entry Order granting #17 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Michael M. Lafeber for Gustafson Gluek PLLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct) (V,S)
December 27, 2023 Filing 23 Attorney Appearance by Holly M. Wilson filed by on behalf of Bassford Remele PA. (Wilson, Holly)
December 22, 2023 Filing 22 Attorney Appearance as Co-Counsel by David R. Hudson filed by on behalf of Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra LLP. (Hudson, David)
December 22, 2023 Filing 21 Affidavit/Declaration of Service filed by Christopher J. Niekamp. Related document(s) #19 , #15 . (Nill, Douglas)
December 21, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of Filing Notice of Tag-Along Action filed by Gray, Ritter & Graham PC, Hare Wynn Newell & Newton LLP, Reed & McGraw PC, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Tag-Along Action)(Kowalski, Gerald)
December 21, 2023 Filing 19 Affidavit/Declaration of Expert Review -- Minn. Stat. 544.42 filed by Christopher J. Niekamp. Related document(s) #15 , #4 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Letter Opinion, #2 Exhibit Expert Report, #3 Exhibit Affidavit Identifying Expert, #4 Exhibit Supplemental Expert Report, #5 Exhibit Joint Prosecution Agreement, #6 Exhibit Minnesota Participation Agreemente)(Nill, Douglas)
December 21, 2023 Filing 18 Attorney Appearance by Gerald R. Kowalski filed by on behalf of Gray, Ritter & Graham PC, Hare Wynn Newell & Newton LLP, Reed & McGraw PC, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. (Kowalski, Gerald)
December 21, 2023 Filing 17 Motion for attorney Michael M. Lafeber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12328421, filed by Defendant Gustafson Gluek PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael M. Lafeber)(Gebolys, Jozeff)
December 21, 2023 Filing 16 Attorney Appearance by John C. Weisensell filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Weisensell, John)
December 21, 2023 Filing 15 Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Christopher J. Niekamp. (Nill, Douglas)
December 19, 2023 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher J. Niekamp. Gray, Ritter & Graham PC waiver sent on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024 filed on behalf of Christopher J. Niekamp (Nill, Douglas)
December 19, 2023 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher J. Niekamp. Reed & McGraw PC waiver sent on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024 filed on behalf of Christopher J. Niekamp (Nill, Douglas)
December 19, 2023 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service by personal service executed upon Watts Guerra LLP on 12/7/2023, filed on behalf of Christopher J. Niekamp Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Nill, Douglas)
December 19, 2023 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service by personal service executed upon Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP on 12/6/2023, filed on behalf of Christopher J. Niekamp Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Nill, Douglas)
December 19, 2023 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service by personal service executed upon Mikal C. Watts on 12/15/2023, filed on behalf of Christopher J. Niekamp Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Nill, Douglas)
December 19, 2023 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service by personal service executed upon Gustafson Gluek PLLC on 12/5/2023, filed on behalf of Christopher J. Niekamp Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Nill, Douglas)
December 19, 2023 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service by personal service executed upon Francisco Guerra on 12/7/2023, filed on behalf of Christopher J. Niekamp Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Nill, Douglas)
December 19, 2023 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service by personal service executed upon Bassford Remele PA on 12/5/2023, filed on behalf of Christopher J. Niekamp Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Nill, Douglas)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 Marginal Entry Order granting #3 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Douglas J. Nill for Randall D. Hebrink and Christopher J. Niekamp. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/30/2023. (R,EM)
November 30, 2023 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (R,EM)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Affidavit of Expert Review filed by Randall D. Hebrink, Christopher J. Niekamp. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter from Expert, #2 Expert Report, #3 Affidavit Identifying Expert, #4 Supplemental Report, #5 Amended and Restated Joint Prosecution Agreement, #6 E-mail re: Litigation Joint Prosecution Agreement, #7 E-mail re: MDL filed cases)(R,EM)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Motion for attorney Douglas J. Nill to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $120, receipt number 14070, filed by Randall D. Hebrink, Christopher J. Niekamp. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Douglas J. Nill, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(R,EM)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Watts Guerra LLP, Bassford Remele PA, Gustafson Gluek PLLC, Schwebel Goetz & Sieben PA, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare Wynn Newell & Newton LLP, Gray, Ritter & Graham PC, Reed & McGraw PC, Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Paul McInnes LLP, Mikal C. Watts, and Francisco Guerra. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (R,EM)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Damages with Table of Contents and Jury Demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid. $402.00. Receipt #14069. Filed by Randall D. Hebrink, Christopher J. Niekamp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (R,EM)
November 28, 2023 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (R,EM)
November 28, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (R,EM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niekamp et al. v. Watts Guerra LLP et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Niekamp
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Represented By: John C. Weisensell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall D. Hebrink
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Represented By: John C. Weisensell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Guerra LLP
Represented By: Christopher L. Goodman
Represented By: David R. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bassford Remele PA
Represented By: Holly M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gustafson Gluek PLLC
Represented By: Michael M. Lafeber
Represented By: Jozeff W. Gebolys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwebel Goetz & Sieben PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP
Represented By: Courtney J. Harrison
Represented By: Douglas R. Dalgleish
Represented By: Gerald R. Kowalski
Represented By: Sarah K. Skow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hare Wynn Newell & Newton LLP
Represented By: Gerald R. Kowalski
Represented By: Sarah K. Skow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray, Ritter & Graham PC
Represented By: Courtney J. Harrison
Represented By: Douglas R. Dalgleish
Represented By: Gerald R. Kowalski
Represented By: Sarah K. Skow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed & McGraw PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul McInnes LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: Christopher L. Goodman
Represented By: David R. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Guerra
Represented By: Christopher L. Goodman
Represented By: David R. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray Reed & McGraw PC
Represented By: Gerald R. Kowalski
Represented By: Sarah K. Skow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?