Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company v. Gree USA, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Defendant: Gree USA, Inc., MJC America, Ltd., Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales Co., Ltd., Home Depot USA., Inc., The Home Depot, Inc. and Home Depot, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00409
Filed: March 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order. Settlement Conference set for 9/17/2024 at 10:00 AM to be held by video conference. Video conference access information will be provided to all participants in advance. Ex parte settlement statements shall be submitted by email to Clay_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 9/3/2024. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements prior to the mediation conference. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 4/29/2024. (R,Ke)
April 24, 2024 Filing 17 Supplement to Motion for attorney Jalen Crawford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12521507, - Declaration for Admission Pro Hac Vice, filed by Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Home Depot USA., Inc., Home Depot, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales Co., Ltd., MJC America, Ltd.. Related document(s) #15 . (Bravo, Eric)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order of Case Management Conference held on 4/24/2024. Time: 15 minutes. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 6/21/2024. Fact Discovery due by 12/13/2024. Case is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay for a settlement conference to be conducted in August or September 2024, at the convenience of the court and the parties. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/24/2024. (M,SM)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jalen Crawford for Gree USA, Inc., MJC America, Ltd., Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales Co., Ltd., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., and Home Depot, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #15 , #17 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/24/2024.(M,SM) Added represented parties on 4/25/2024 (S,JM).
April 22, 2024 Filing 15 Motion for attorney Jalen Crawford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12521507, filed by Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Home Depot USA., Inc., Home Depot, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales Co., Ltd., MJC America, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jalen Crawford)(Bravo, Eric)
April 16, 2024 Filing 14 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. Related document(s) #12 .(Barbee, David)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Michael Ciamaichelo for Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #13 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/12/2024.(M,SM)
April 11, 2024 Filing 13 Motion for attorney Michael J. Ciamaichelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12503992, filed by Plaintiff Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration/Certificate of Good Standing of Michael J. Ciamaichelo, #2 Proposed Order granting motion for pro hac vice)(Barbee, David)
March 21, 2024 Filing 12 Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice: Case management conference to be held on 4/24/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. Counsel to call the court's bridge line at 877-411-9748, and use access code 1231873. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(M,SM)
March 11, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Opus Investment Management, Inc., Other Affiliate The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., Other Affiliate The Hanover Insurance Company for Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company filed by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Barbee, David)
March 11, 2024 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Home Depot, Inc.. (Bravo, Eric)
March 11, 2024 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Home Depot USA., Inc.. (Bravo, Eric)
March 11, 2024 Filing 8 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Home Depot USA., Inc., Home Depot, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales Co., Ltd., MJC America, Ltd.. (Bravo, Eric)
March 7, 2024 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales Co., Ltd.. (Bravo, Eric)
March 7, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai. (Bravo, Eric)
March 7, 2024 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by MJC America, Ltd.. (Bravo, Eric)
March 7, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Gree USA, Inc.. (Bravo, Eric)
March 5, 2024 Notice by Clerk that Gree USA, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,MI)
March 5, 2024 Notice to Attorney Assunta A. Karris. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
March 4, 2024 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,JM)
March 4, 2024 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Gree USA, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Bravo, Eric)
March 4, 2024 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lucas County, Ohio Common Pleas Court, case number G-4801- CI-0202401275-000 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 405, receipt number AOHNDC-12437906. Filed by Gree USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Proceedings, #2 Exhibit B - Home Depot Consent to Removal). (Bravo, Eric)
March 4, 2024 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (S,JM)
March 4, 2024 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (S,JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company v. Gree USA, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Represented By: David S. Barbee
Represented By: Michael Ciamaichelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA, Inc.
Represented By: Eric S. Bravo
Represented By: Jalen Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America, Ltd.
Represented By: Eric S. Bravo
Represented By: Jalen Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai
Represented By: Eric S. Bravo
Represented By: Jalen Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Eric S. Bravo
Represented By: Jalen Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA., Inc.
Represented By: Assunta A. Karris
Represented By: Eric S. Bravo
Represented By: Jalen Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Assunta A. Karris
Represented By: Eric S. Bravo
Represented By: Jalen Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?