Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company v. Fox Valley Construction Group, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Fox Valley Construction Group, Inc., Secor Village North LLC and Dorr Street Plaza, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00470
Filed: March 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. This Court held an Initial Telephone Conference on May 3, 2024. Counsel agreed to confer and provide this Court with a stipulation with respect to the citizenship of the members of the LLC parties reflecting whether this Court has diversity jurisdiction. This Court set case deadlines as follows: Defendants may file a Motion to Dismiss/Transfer by May 17, 2024. Plaintiff may respond by May 31, 2024. After those initial filings, this Court will advise whether a reply is needed and/or a hearing. In the interim, all legal filings are stayed, including pending Answer dates. Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/6/2024. (20 mins) (V,S)
April 29, 2024 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. Secor Village North LLC waiver sent on 4/12/2024, answer due 6/11/2024 filed on behalf of Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company (Bruns, Thomas)
April 29, 2024 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. Dorr Street Plaza, LLC waiver sent on 4/12/2024, answer due 6/11/2024 filed on behalf of Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company (Bruns, Thomas)
April 26, 2024 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Ashley G. LaRock and Thomas L. Rosenberg filed by on behalf of Fox Valley Construction Group, Inc.. (LaRock, Ashley)
April 21, 2024 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Norman A Abood filed by on behalf of Secor Village North LLC. (Abood, Norman)
April 21, 2024 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Norman A Abood filed by on behalf of Dorr Street Plaza, LLC. (Abood, Norman)
April 16, 2024 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Dorr Street Plaza LLC, filed by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. filed on behalf of Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Bruns, Thomas)
April 16, 2024 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Secor Village North LLC, filed by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. filed on behalf of Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified mail return receipt)(Bruns, Thomas)
April 15, 2024 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Telephone Conference set for Friday, May 3, 2024 at 9 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line (provided by email). No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Telephone Conference. (V,S)
April 2, 2024 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. Fox Valley Construction Group, Inc. waiver sent on 3/13/2024, answer due 5/13/2024 filed on behalf of Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company (Bruns, Thomas)
March 22, 2024 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (R,EM)
March 15, 2024 Filing 5 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/15/24. (R,EM)
March 13, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. (Bruns, Thomas)
March 13, 2024 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons received. No summons issued. (R,EM)
March 13, 2024 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Bruns, Thomas)
March 13, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12454356. Filed by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint and Attachments, #2 Brokerage Policy, #3 Disclaimer) (Bruns, Thomas)
March 13, 2024 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (R,EM)
March 13, 2024 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (R,EM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company v. Fox Valley Construction Group, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas B. Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Valley Construction Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley G. LaRock
Represented By: Thomas L. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secor Village North LLC
Represented By: Norman A Abood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorr Street Plaza, LLC
Represented By: Norman A Abood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?