Hester v. RMF Nooter, LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Benford Hester
Defendant: RMF Nooter, LLC, Nooter Toledo, Cenovus U.S. Corp. doing business as Cenovus Toledo Refinery, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 8 and International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Fourth District
Case Number: 3:2024cv00519
Filed: March 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #11 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jacob J. Demree for International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Fourth District. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge James R. Knepp II on 4/30/2024. (B,JL)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #10 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Lucas R. Aubrey for International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Fourth District. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge James R. Knepp II on 4/30/2024. (B,JL)
April 29, 2024 Filing 11 Motion for leave for attorney Jacob J. Demree to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 14325, filed by Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Fourth District. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacob J. Demree, #2 Envelope)(S,DM)
April 29, 2024 Filing 10 Motion for leave for attorney Lucas R. Aubrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 14325, filed by Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Fourth District. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lucas R. Aubrey, #2 Envelope)(S,DM)
April 25, 2024 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Benford Hester. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Fourth District waiver sent on 3/27/2024, answer due 5/28/2024 filed on behalf of Benford Hester (Landry, Francis)
April 17, 2024 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Benford Hester. RMF Nooter, LLC waiver sent on 3/27/2024, answer due 5/28/2024 filed on behalf of Benford Hester (Landry, Francis)
April 16, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) (Partial Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 8 ONLY) filed by Benford Hester. (Landry, Francis)
March 27, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Directed to Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Fourth District filed by Benford Hester. (Landry, Francis)
March 27, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Directed to Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 8 filed by Benford Hester. (Landry, Francis)
March 27, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Directed to Defendant Cenovus U.S. Corp., etc. filed by Benford Hester. (Landry, Francis)
March 27, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Directed to Defendant RMF Nooter, LLC, etc. filed by Benford Hester. (Landry, Francis)
March 20, 2024 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons received. No summons issued. (R,EM)
March 20, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12467015. Filed by Benford Hester. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landry, Francis)
March 20, 2024 Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (R,EM)
March 20, 2024 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (R,EM)
March 20, 2024 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (R,EM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hester v. RMF Nooter, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMF Nooter, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nooter Toledo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenovus U.S. Corp. doing business as Cenovus Toledo Refinery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Fourth District
Represented By: Jacob J. Demree
Represented By: Lucas R. Aubrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benford Hester
Represented By: Francis J. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?