December 9, 2021 |
Filing
467
Memorandum Opinion and Order for the reasons set forth herein, plaintiff's motion for leave to substitute expert witness is denied. (Doc. No. 451 .) Judge Sara Lioi on 12/9/2021. (E,CK)
|
August 27, 2021 |
Filing
439
Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the reasons set forth herein, defendant's renewed Rule 50(a) motion (Doc. No. 426 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion (in any form) during the new trial. Plaintiff's motion to reope n the record (which the Court construes as a motion to reopen expert discovery) and to amend the second amended complaint (Doc. No. 431 ) is denied. By separate order, the Court will schedule the final pretrial conference and jury trial, along with all trial-related events. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/27/2021. (E,CK)
|
March 15, 2019 |
Filing
409
Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the reasons set forth herein, U.S. Steel's 405 renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law is granted, resolving all remaining claims and closing this case. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/15/2019. (T,Je)
|
March 21, 2016 |
Filing
371
Memorandum Opinion and Order (Including Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law) (Nunc Pro Tunc to Correct Amended Judgment Amount in Paragraph 3 of Doc. No. 370 ): Allied's Motion for Stay of Execution and Approval of Alternative Securi ty (Doc. No. 318 ) is denied. In order to seek a stay of execution of the Amended Judgment Entry, Allied must submit a supersedeas bond in the full amount of the Judgment Entry. In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 62(d), any stay will take effect onl y if and when the Court approves the bond. Until such time, U.S. Steel may continue to execute upon the Amended Judgment Entry. Accordingly, simultaneous with the entry of these Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, the Court is signing and entering U.S. Steel's October 22 Writ and November 2 Writ (Doc. Nos. 325 , 334 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/21/2016. (P,J)
|
March 17, 2016 |
Filing
370
Memorandum Opinion and Order (Including Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law): Allied's Motion for Stay of Execution and Approval of Alternative Security (Doc. No. 318 ) is denied. In order to seek a stay of execution of the Amended Judgment Entry, Allied must submit a supersedeas bond in the full amount of the Judgment Entry. In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 62(d), any stay will take effect only if and when the Court approves the bond. Until such time, U.S. Steel may continu e to execute upon the Amended Judgment Entry. Accordingly, simultaneous with the entry of these Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, the Court is signing and entering U.S. Steel's October 22 Writ and November 2 Writ (Doc. Nos. 325 , 334 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/17/2016. (P,J)
|
September 25, 2015 |
Filing
313
Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the reasons and to the extent set forth herein, defendant's motion for prejudgment interest (Doc. No. 297 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay defendant prejudgment interest on the $10 million Manufacturing Advance Payment, at the statutory rate of 6% (i.e., $1,643.84/day), beginning on August 14, 2012 and continuing until the date of the final judgment in this case. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/25/2015. (P,J)
|
April 22, 2015 |
Filing
249
Memorandum Opinion and Order: Defendant's motion in limine (Doc. No. 212 ) to limit the admission of parol evidence is denied without prejudice to raising parol evidence challenges at any appropriate time within the context of the trial. A ruling on defendant's motion in limine (Doc. No. 213 ) to exclude evidence related to prior litigation is deferred until the Court has more information. Plaintiff's motion in limine (Doc. No. 214 ) to exclude certain evidence and argu ments is denied without prejudice to appropriate objections being raised by either party during the course of trial. Defendant's motion in limine (Doc. No. 211 ) to bifurcate trial on liability and damages is denied. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/22/2015. (P,J)
|
April 6, 2015 |
Filing
228
Memorandum Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's motion in limine to preclude selected portions of the expert testimony of Berkeley Research Group (Doc. No. 185 ) is granted in part and denied in part; plaintiff's motion to strike supplem ental rebuttal report of Berkeley Research Group (Doc. No. 224 ) is denied. Defendant's motion to exclude purported expert testimony and opinions of Allied experts Ed Klein, Gordon Lindquist, and Mark Gleason (Doc. No. 188 ) is denied. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/6/2015. (P,J)
|
February 13, 2015 |
Filing
221
Memorandum Opinion and Order: Defendant's motion to strike the motion for reconsideration (Doc. No. 182 ) is denied. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Doc. No. 178 ) is granted; but, upon reconsideration, the Court adheres to its original decision with respect to defendant's second counterclaim. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/13/2015. (P,J)
|
September 30, 2014 |
Filing
174
Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the reasons set forth herein, and with the contract constructions set forth, the Court grants summary judgment in favor of U.S. Steel on Count VI of Allied's complaint and on its own Counterclaim II. Summary judgment is denied in all other respects. (Related Doc # 118 , 134 , 141 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 9/30/2014. (P,J)
|
September 27, 2013 |
Filing
84
Memorandum Opinion and Order: Defendant's partial motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 46 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Only Count VIII is dismissed; all other counts of the second amended complaint survive the motion. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/27/2013. (P,J)
|