Myers v. Mutual of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tina Myers
Defendant: Mutual of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2014cv02421
Filed: October 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Youngstown Office
County: Columbiana
Presiding Judge: Benita Y. Pearson
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Memorandum of Opinion and Order Finding that Plaintiff is entitled to attorney's fees and costs, the Court grants Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees, in part, in the amount of $21,217.00. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/23/2017. Related document(s) 34 , 42 , 43 , 44 , 45 . (JLG)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees is granted, in part. Plaintiff's Motions for Rule 60 relief and to supplement the record are denied. Not later than 14 days from the issuance of this Order, Plaintiff's counsel shall file supplemental materials showing that its requested rates are reasonable for the area. Plaintiff's counsel shall also submit a memorandum specifying the total amount of attorneys fees and detailing those items for which reimbursement is sought. Defendant shall respond in 7 days. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/23/2017. Related document(s) 34 , 37 . (JLG)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Memorandum of Opinion and Order The Court finds that the Plan Administrator arbitrarily and capriciously denied coverage because its decision was not the result of "a deliberate principled reasoning process." Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Merits (ECF No. 19 ) is denied. The case is remanded to the plan administrator for a full and fair review. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/29/2016. (JLG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Mutual of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Myers
Represented By: Emily E. Gilbert
Represented By: Andrew L. Margolius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?