Handel's Enterprises, Inc. v. Schulenburg et al
Plaintiff: Handel's Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Kenneth S. Schulenburg, Moonlight101, Inc. and Juliana Ortiz
Case Number: 4:2018cv00508
Filed: March 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Youngstown Office
County: Mahoning
Presiding Judge: Benita Y. Pearson
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Memorandum Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth in this order, Plaintiff Handel's Emergency Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. 99 ) is GRANTED. The Court will issue a separate order contemporaneous with this opinion providing for the terms of the preliminary injunction and requiring Handel's to post a bond. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 1/27/2020. (L,Ja)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Memorandum Opinion and Order: For reasons set forth in this order, (1) Handel's, Fisher, and Brown's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 72 ) is GRANTED; (2) Schulenburg and Moonlight101's Motion for Partial Summary J udgment (Doc. No. 73 ) is DENIED; (3) Schulenburg, Ortiz, and Moonlight101's Motion to Dissolve Injunction (Doc. No. 85 ) is DENIED; and (4) Handel's Motion to Correct the Expiration Date (Doc. No. 87 ) is DENIED. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 1/6/2020. (L,Ja)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, Defendants' 50 Motion to stay enforcement of the Preliminary Injunction is denied. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 10/16/2018. (JLG)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Memorandum Opinion and Order For the reasons stated, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Stay, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue (ECF No. 23 ) is denied. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 6/22/2018. (S,L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handel's Enterprises, Inc. v. Schulenburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Handel's Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Batts
Represented By: Andrew G. Fiorella
Represented By: Warren T. McClurg, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth S. Schulenburg
Represented By: R. Michael Ghilezan
Represented By: Raymond V. Vasvari, Jr.
Represented By: K. Ann Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moonlight101, Inc.
Represented By: R. Michael Ghilezan
Represented By: Raymond V. Vasvari, Jr.
Represented By: K. Ann Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliana Ortiz
Represented By: R. Michael Ghilezan
Represented By: Raymond V. Vasvari, Jr.
Represented By: K. Ann Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?